This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 04:48:07 (UTC).

SHERVIN PISHEVAR VS. MATTHEW RHOADES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/06/2017 SHERVIN PISHEVAR filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MATTHEW RHOADES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2305

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

POUNDER, JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 10

DEFINERS CORP. A BUISNESS ENTITY

DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS A BUISNESS ENTITY

RHOADES, MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL

DEFINERS CORP.

DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

POUNDER, JOSEPH

RHOADES, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMMANUEL, ERIC J.

Attorney at QUIONN EMANUEL URQUHART

865 South Figueroa St, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

KIERNAN, DAVID C.

Attorney at JONES DAY

555 California Street, 26Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

CARVIN, MICHAEL A.

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001-2113

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61642268)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATION OF SHERVIN PISHEVAR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY J. MILES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION; OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Evidence in Support of Special Mot

OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Con

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Declaration of Jeffrey J. Miles In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition To

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY J. MILES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Declaration of Shervin Pishevar In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to

DECLARATION OF SHERVIN PISHEVAR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition To Defen

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61513358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 61499495) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL POUNDER, JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL DEFINERS CORP. A BUISNESS ENTITY DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS A BUISNESS ENTITY

Notice of Entry of Order Granting Ex Parte Application of Michael A. C

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 61499495) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL POUNDER, JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY MICHAEL A. CARVIN FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61484259) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH M. BURNSIDE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH M. BURNSIDE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MICHAEL A. CARVIN TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61484259) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MICHAEL A. CARVIN TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC

VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MICHAEL A. CARVIN TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61484259) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF MI

APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (NOTICE OF APPLICATION) (TRANSACTION ID # 61484259) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

Amended Proof of Service

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61436582) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FILE & SERVEXPRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 61434795) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

DECLARATION OF COLIN REED ISO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH

DECLARATION OF COLIN REED IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61434795) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNOV-14-2018 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY MICHAEL A. CARVIN - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON FEB-02-2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MICHAEL A. CARVIN Off Calendar Nov-16-2018 Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed (Sweep); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Mar-23-2018 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP., DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 IS OFF CALENDAR. THE ENTIRE ACTION WAS DISMISSED ON FEBRUARY 2, 2018. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, TORREANOM@AOL.COM, REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT Off Calendar Feb-23-2018 Text Ruling MINI MINUTES: No appearances. The Court adopts the tentative ruling as follows: DEFENDANT MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP., DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16. Defendants' motion to strike complaint is OFF CALENDAR. The entire action was dismissed on February 2, 2018. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, CSR#8600, torreanom@aol.com, Reported. (D302\/RBU); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61642268)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, THE COURT ADOPTS THE TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP., DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS'SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 IS CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 23, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M. PER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MTORREANO@SFTC.ORG, REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JAN-23-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61434795) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 61434795) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61434795) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW POUNDER, JOSEPH DEFINERS CORP. DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS HEARING SET FOR JAN-05-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$1800.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030665), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-13-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT POUNDER, JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030665), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-13-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030665), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-07-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS A BUISNESS ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030665), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-07-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DEFINERS CORP. A BUISNESS ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1017B06F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAMATION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PISHEVAR, SHERVIN AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT RHOADES, MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL POUNDER, JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL DEFINERS CORP. A BUISNESS ENTITY DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS A BUISNESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-05-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-19-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2305
Case Title:SHERVIN PISHEVAR VS. MATTHEW RHOADES ET AL
Court Date:FEB-23-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:The matter is on calendar for Friday, February 23, 2018, Line 7, DEFENDANTS MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP., AND DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS' MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT.Defendants' motion to strike complaint is OFF CALENDAR. The entire action was dismissed on February 2, 2018. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/RBU)


Case Number:*******2305
Case Title:SHERVIN PISHEVAR VS. MATTHEW RHOADES ET AL
Court Date:JAN-23-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, January 23, 2018, Line 13, DEFENDANTS MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP., DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS' MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT.Continued to February 23, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. per agreement of the parties. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******2305
Case Title:SHERVIN PISHEVAR VS. MATTHEW RHOADES ET AL
Court Date:JAN-12-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON FRIDAY, JANUARY 12, 2018, LINE 7DEFENDANTS MATTHEW RHOADES, JOSEPH POUNDER, DEFINERS CORP. and DEFINERS PUBLIC AFFAIRS' MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINTCONTINUED to January 23, 2018 at 9:30 AM per agreement of the parties.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMANUEL ERIC J. ESQ.