This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 18:38:51 (UTC).

SHEREEN PINTO et al VS. M. GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2011 SHEREEN PINTO filed an Other lawsuit against M GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC , A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6428

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Intervenor Defendants

2189 MARKET STREET OWNERS ASSOCIATION , A CALIF ORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL

GRAVITT, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL

JOINT MAINTENANCE COMMITTEE, INC, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

CARIDAD GRAVITT TRUST

CARIDAD GRAVITT, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND JOINT MAINTENANCE COMMITTEE, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

PANTALEONI, ANTHONY A

MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BARNECUT ROOFING COMPANY, INC.

TILE WEST, INC.

DEGLIANTONI, GARY

KOTAS/PANTALEONI ARCHITECTS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 6-200 INCLUSIVE

LINCOLN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CANAVERO, FRED

GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC

STATE SHEET METAL WORKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GREENE, LEE

MOES 7-50, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM

Cross Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant

PANTALEONI, ANTHONY A

Defendant and Intervenor

LINCOLN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Intervenor Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, SCOTT ALAN

Attorney at WILLIAMS & GUMBINER LLP

100 Drakes Landing Road, Suite 260

Greenbrae, CA 94904

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LIFTER, JILL JAYE

Attorney at RYAN & LIFTER

2010 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 330

San Ramon, CA 94583-1344

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 600

San Deigo, CA 92101

TOWNSEND, KASEY C.

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

275 Battery Street, Ste 550

San Francisco, CA 94111

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.

Attorney at SELLAR HAZARD & LUCIA A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

201 N. Civic Drive, Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ROCHA, CRUZ

DAY, MATTHEW R.

Porter Scott, 350 University Avenue, Ste 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

KIRVIN, THOMAS RICHARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTANA, TCHENG, VIERRA & SYMONDS

71 Stevenson Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

PHAN-QUANG, TRUMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HELEN SANTANA

71 Stevenson St Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

TAPP, CHAD S.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GARSON, EDWARD PAUL

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2722

Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

TOWNSEND, KASEY C.

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

275 Battery Street, Ste 550

San Francisco, CA 94111

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.

Attorney at SELLAR HAZARD & LUCIA A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

201 N. Civic Drive, Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

MORROW, WILLIAM D.

Attorney at MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Boulevard, Ste. 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 926260000

DAHL, GREGORY GORDON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY R. WAGNER

2633 Camino Ramon, Ste 210

San Ramon, CA 94583

CAPPELLUTI, LISA M.

Attorney at LORBER, GREENFIELD & POLITO, LLP

150 Post St., Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

STAPLES, WILLIAM HACKING

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. # 800

Walnut Creek, CA 945960000

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL 2189 MARKET STREET OWNERS ASSOCIATION , A CALIF ORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION CARIDAD GRAVITT TRUST GRAVITT, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL JOINT MAINTENANCE COMMITTEE, INC, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT M. GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BARNECUT ROOFING COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORP ORATION F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STATE SHEET METAL WORKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TILE WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM DOES 1 TO 3000, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-11-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-06-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-26-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC. (Fee:410.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC.

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TILE WEST, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT TILE WEST, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT AND COMPLAINT; [DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED THERETO], PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-24-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-13-2012 ON DEFENDANT M. GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Order Compellin

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PLTFS' MOTION FOR ORER COMPELLING ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57943790) FILED BY INTERVENOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Entry of Order Granting Good Faith Settlement Determination

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57943790) FILED BY INTERVENOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR HIS/HER/ ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58154526) AS TO DEFENDANT F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CANAVERO, FRED MARSHALL, MARC MARSHALL, MARVELLE ESA MARVELLE MARQUERITE

Lexington Insurance Request for Dismissal of Complaint in Intervention

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58154966)

Plaintiffs Request for Dismissal of Complaint against Greene and Sons

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58154966) AS TO DEFENDANT GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58212974) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CANAVERO, FRED

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-24-2015 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO 11-24-15 OSC HEARING, RESCHEDULED

PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO 11-24-15 OSC HEARING, RESCHEDULED FOR 5-24-16 (TRANSACTION ID # 58746413)

409 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO 11-24-15 OSC HEARING, RESCHEDULED FOR 5-24-16 (TRANSACTION ID # 58746413)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-24-2015 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58212974) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CANAVERO, FRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-24-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58154966) AS TO DEFENDANT GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58154966)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR HIS/HER/ ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58154526) AS TO DEFENDANT F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CANAVERO, FRED MARSHALL, MARC MARSHALL, MARVELLE ESA MARVELLE MARQUERITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57943790) FILED BY INTERVENOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PLTFS' MOTION FOR ORER COMPELLING ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57943790) FILED BY INTERVENOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF GREENE & SONS MECHANICAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
666 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BARNECUT ROOFING COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORP ORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-13-2012 ON DEFENDANT M. GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT AND COMPLAINT; [DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED THERETO], PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-24-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-11-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT TILE WEST, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TILE WEST, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TILE WEST, INC. (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PINTO, SHEREEN AN INDIVIDUAL 2189 MARKET STREET OWNERS ASSOCIATION , A CALIF ORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION CARIDAD GRAVITT TRUST GRAVITT, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL JOINT MAINTENANCE COMMITTEE, INC, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT M. GAEHWILER CONSTRUCTION,INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BARNECUT ROOFING COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORP ORATION F.FERRANDO & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STATE SHEET METAL WORKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TILE WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION MILLER, THOMAS STOCKDALE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA TSM DOES 1 TO 3000, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-11-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-06-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-26-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TILE WEST, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE SHEET METAL WORKS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LINCOLN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory G Dahl