Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 06:48:22 (UTC).

SHELBY STEWART ET AL VS. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 SHELBY STEWART filed an Other lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG, ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO and ANDREW Y.S. CHENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0966

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDINA, FELICIA

Attorney at MEDINA ORTHWEIN LLP

230 Grand Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AFTER 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 66660414)

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 66623513)

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR P

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION ID # 66613205) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PENDING AS TO JUDGE ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO (TRANSACTION ID # 66613205) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Order Granting Complex Designation and for Single Assignment

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO FOR ALL PURPOSES. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT IS SET FOR JUN-24-2021 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 304. SEP-22-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPT. 610 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DESIGNATION OF CASE AS COMPLEX PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT SECTION 3.400 AND SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT LOCAL RULE 3.5 (C)

EXHIBIT 1 TO [PREVIOUSLY FILED] DECLARATION OF FELICIA M. MEDINA IN SU

EXHIBIT 1 TO [PREVIOUSLY FILED] DECLARATION OF FELICIA M. MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100130056) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRE

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

DECLARATION OF FELICIA M. MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PR

DECLARATION OF FELICIA M. MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; ***COURT REPORTER FEES PAID*** (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEME

UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR MAY-17-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100129618) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-22-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-21-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-30-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar May-17-2021 Single Assignment; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): STATS DISPOSITION Off Calendar May-21-2021 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING SET FOR JUL-29-2021 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AFTER 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 66660414)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL, SET FOR JUN-24-2021 IN DEPT. 304, IS OFF CALENDAR. 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO THE HON. ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO IS SUSTAINED. CASE PENDING REASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUSTAINING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 66623513)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION ID # 66613205) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PENDING AS TO JUDGE ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO (TRANSACTION ID # 66613205) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS SHELBY STEWART, CHARLETA DABROWSKI, BENEDICT JOHNSON, KENYA MAYFIELD'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. NO APPEARANCES, THE TENTATIVE RULING IS ADOPTED AS FOLLOWS: OFF CALENDAR PENDING COMPLEX DESIGNATION. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN; CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA; NOT REPORTED. (302/EPS)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0621423M013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF FELICIA M. MEDINA IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; ***COURT REPORTER FEES PAID*** (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100129652) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR MAY-17-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialPayment : COMPLEX LIT FEE FOR PLAINTIFF; Amount : $1060; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : H2321423C016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFEE PAID ON: STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DESIGNATION OF CASE AS COMPLEX PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT SECTION 3.400 AND SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT LOCAL RULE 3.5 (C) (TRANSACTION ID # 100129621) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:$1060.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100129618) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1121422F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART, SHELBY , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED DABROWSKI, CHARLETA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JOHNSON, BENEDICT , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED MAYFIELD, KENYA , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-22-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-21-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-30-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant