Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 16:26:04 (UTC).

SHELBY DRAYTON LABADIE VS. ERIC SHAHN LABADIE

Case Summary

On 05/27/2014 SHELBY DRAYTON LABADIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ERIC SHAHN LABADIE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1632

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

Respondent

LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN

San Francisco, CA 94158

Other

SLABACH, MARJORIE A.

Fremont, CA 94538

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

METOYER, JESSICA N

Attorney at METOYER LAW OFFICES

291 Geary St. Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94102

Respondent Attorney

RAPOPORT, LISSA L

Other Attorney

SLABACH, MARJORIE A

Po Box 1367

Fremont, CA 94538

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: RAPOPORT, LISSA L WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS MAY-15-2015 SIGNED BY PRO TEM JUDGE: MARJORIE A. SLABACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY OTHER SLABACH, MARJORIE A. (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY RESPONDENT LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESPONDENT LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: MAY-27-2014, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: JUN-05-2014 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ATTACHED FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER LABADIE, SHELBY DRAYTON AS TO RESPONDENT LABADIE, ERIC SHAHN SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less