This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:42:14 (UTC).

SHARLINE DAVIS-ARCE et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2007 SHARLINE DAVIS-ARCE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4430

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

DAVIS JR, BOBBY AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

DAVIS, JOSEPH AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

Defendants

NEPTUNE CHEMICAL PUMP CO. INC.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

GRINNELL LLC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

DOES 1-8500

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

GRINNELL CORPORATION

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

THE TORO COMPANY

SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

BOVEE & CRAIL CONSTRUCTION CO.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-1,C,H,I

BOVEE & CRAIL CONSTRUCTION CO, A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

HARTWELL, MORTIMER H

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

Other Attorneys

LANNUS, PAUL

Attorney at C.W. WOOD & ASSOCIATES, PC

301 Howard Street, 19Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFID COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20687373) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORP. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20708627) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal [as to Defendant Lamons Gasket Company only]

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24209311) AS TO DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE - MSJ

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24578466) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER L. ALESIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER L. ALESIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 25569622) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS JR, BOBBY AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS-REEDY, AMBER AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS, JOSEPH AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES CHARLES M. NAYLOR, JR., AND ANTHONY SAAVEDRA FROM OFFERING TESTIMONY AT TRIAL

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES CHARLES M. NAYLOR, JR., AND ANTHONY SAAVEDRA FROM OFFERING TESTIMONY AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 25767000) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.?S JOINDER IN MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS BY CO-DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16]

JOINDER TO MOTION IN LIMINE AND OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS BY CO-DEFTS TO PLTF [MO IN LIMINE NO. 16] (TRANSACTION ID # 26144966) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO REQUIRE THE APPLICATION OF THE ?SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR? STANDARD OF CAUSATION [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 26]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO REQUIRE THE APPL OF THE "SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR" STANDARD OF CAUSATION [MO IN LIMINE NO. 26] (TRANSACTION ID # 26144966) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26144966) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

ANSWER OF BOVEE & CRAIL CONSTRUCTION CO. TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18574137) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOVEE & CRAIL CONSTRUCTION CO, A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

EXHIBITS A-H TO THE DECLARATION OF RYAN C. BLACKHART IN SUPPORT OF CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

EXHIBITS A-H TO THE DECLARATION OF RYAN C. BLACKHART IN SUPPORT OF CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY (TRANSACTION ID # 23698414) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 24578466) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. HEARING SET FOR JUN-23-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

EXHIBIT C PART 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF MEGAN CESARE-EASTMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT C PART 1 TO THE DECL OF MEGAN CESARE-EASTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 24578466) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Request for Dismissal (re: Special Electric Company, Inc. only)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24934372) AS TO DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES CHARLES M. NAYLOR, JR., AND ANTHONY SAAVEDRA FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES CHARLES M. NAYLOR, JR., AND ANTHONY SAAVEDRA FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 25767000) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 25907347) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S, MOTION IN LIMINE TO DISCLOSE ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS AT TIME OF TRIAL [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO DISCLOSE ALL REMAINING DEFTS AT TIME OF TRIAL [MO IN LIMINE NO. 8] (TRANSACTION ID # 26144966) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE CONSUMER EXPECTATIONS TEST [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 30]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE CONSUMER EXPECTATIONS TEST [MO IN LIMINE NO. 30] (TRANSACTION ID # 26144966) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO APR-30-2016 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17984700) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17984700) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17871222) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 17842481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17842481) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17802609) FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SHARLINE ARCE UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 17050494) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS JR, BOBBY AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS-REEDY, AMBER AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS, JOSEPH AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS JR, BOBBY AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS-REEDY, AMBER AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS, JOSEPH AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS-ARCE, SHARLINE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS JR, BOBBY AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS-REEDY, AMBER AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED DAVIS, JOSEPH AS LEGAL HEIRS OF BOBBY DAVIS, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-1,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-16-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TORO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OSCAR E. ERICKSON INC. is a litigant