This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 12:27:58 (UTC).

SHANTELL HERNDON VS. WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2012 SHANTELL HERNDON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9758

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNDON, SHANTELL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25, INCL.

WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNA, ALEXIS S.

Attorney at WINER & MCKENNA,LLP

1999 Harrison Street,Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

VON LOEWENFELDT, MICHAEL

Attorney at KERR & WAGSTAFFE LLP

100 Spear Street Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

PATTISON, ROBERT MALCOLM

MOSS, GARY ELLIOTT

Attorney at MOSS & HOUGH

1388 Sutter Street, Ste 1210

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL AS TO DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-05-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-21-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL SERVED APR-16-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-02-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-05-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PATTISON ROBERT M

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL AS TO DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCL.

ORDER

ORDER ON STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

ORDER

ORDER ON STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: VON LOEWENFELDT, MICHAEL SUBSTITUTED FOR PATTISON ROBERT M AS ATTORNEY FOR WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: MOSS, GARY ELLIOTT ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-15-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED 6/19/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: MOSS, GARY ELLIOTT ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: VON LOEWENFELDT, MICHAEL SUBSTITUTED FOR PATTISON ROBERT M AS ATTORNEY FOR WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER'S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185 = (302/MJM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-27-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-02-2013 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON OCT-15-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PURSUANT TO EX PARTE ORDER FILED ON 1/25/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2012
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PATTISON ROBERT M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-02-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-05-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL SERVED APR-16-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNDON, SHANTELL AS TO DEFENDANT WESTSIDE COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH CENTER, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-05-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-21-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less