This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:32:15 (UTC).

SERGIO ARREAGA ET AL VS. ADOLFO GONZALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by SERGIO ARREAGA against ADOLFO GONZALES in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4191

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARREAGA, SERGIO

MORAN, ONDINA

Defendants

GONZALES, ADOLFO

BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA

DOES 1 TO 30

GONZALES, TERESA

GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES)

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63137618)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - TERESA GONZALEZ

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 62272140): BRYDON, JOHN R SUBSTITUTED FOR JONES, ALEXANDER AS ATTORNEY FOR GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - ADOLFO GONZALEZ

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 62272140): BRYDON, JOHN R SUBSTITUTED FOR JONES, ALEXANDER AS ATTORNEY FOR GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-01-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (610)

Objection To The Notice of Time and Place of Trial

OBJECTION TO THE NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 62218623) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

Objection to Notice of Time and Place of Trial

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100041558) (TRANSACTION ID # 100041558) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-28-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040907) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA JURY DEMANDED

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62167825) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62167825) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62145237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARREAGA, SERGIO MORAN, ONDINA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Defendants Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62042200) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036827) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARREAGA, SERGIO MORAN, ONDINA AS TO DEFENDANT GONZALES, ADOLFO GONZALES, TERESA BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-09-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818716J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W1918710J010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818518F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818510F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918315J003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W0918208F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-01-2019 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 4/5/19. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63137618)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 62272140): BRYDON, JOHN R SUBSTITUTED FOR JONES, ALEXANDER AS ATTORNEY FOR GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-28-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040907) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62167825) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62167825) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62145237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARREAGA, SERGIO MORAN, ONDINA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62042200) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, ADOLFO (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ADOLFO GONZALES) GONZALEZ, TERESA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TERESA GONZALES) (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036827) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 61779227) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ARREAGA, SERGIO MORAN, ONDINA (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARREAGA, SERGIO MORAN, ONDINA AS TO DEFENDANT GONZALES, ADOLFO GONZALES, TERESA BARRIOS, GRIUMILDA DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-09-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less