This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 21:46:35 (UTC).

SEAN MCCLUSKEY et al VS. GORDON GALLIC et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2012 SEAN MCCLUSKEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GORDON GALLIC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2211

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST

LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN ALL PERSONS UKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE (THE "UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS")

PARRAULT, ROMAIN

CSILLAG, MARIE-JOSE

CSILLAG, JACQUES

GALLIC, GORDON

Eugene, OR 97401

PARRAULT, SOPHIE

DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEYAND, ALEXANDER MICHAEL

Attorney at WEYAND LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

531 Howard, First Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-14-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE IN REAL PROPERTY TO PLAINTIFFS SEAN MCCLUSKEY AND YU-CHUN MELISSA LIN, TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST, DATED JANUARY 23, 2012 SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING EXPIRATION OF DATE FOR ANY "UNKNOWN DEFTS" TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT SERVED BY PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (GRANTED)

QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 AS TO DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 AS TO DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 SERVED JUL-19-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JUL-22-2012 ON DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

ANSWER

ANSWER TO QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON (Fee:450.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 (Fee:20.00)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MTN FOR JUDGMNT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 HEARING SET FOR NOV-27-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

MINUTE ORDER RE:

MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CSILLAG, JACQUES CSILLAG, MARIE-JOSE PARRAULT, SOPHIE PARRAULT, ROMAIN (Fee:1800.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 206'S OUTBOX.)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER) 10/07/2013; 10/14/2013; 10/21/2013; 10/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 SERVED SEP-27-2013, PUBLICATION ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-14-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE IN REAL PROPERTY TO PLAINTIFFS SEAN MCCLUSKEY AND YU-CHUN MELISSA LIN, TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST, DATED JANUARY 23, 2012 SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF APR-08-2014, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING EXPIRATION OF DATE FOR ANY "UNKNOWN DEFTS" TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT SERVED BY PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: MITCH LYON , CSR#6840. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-08-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketCONFIRMATION NO OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING EXPIRATION OF DATE FOR ANY "UNKNOWN DEFTS" TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT SERVED BY PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketPOS OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING EXPIRATION OF DATE FOR ANY "UNKNOWN DEFTS" TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT SERVED BY PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; SUPPORTING MEMOO P/A; DECLARATIONS; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR MAY-14-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMTN FOR JUDGMNT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 HEARING SET FOR NOV-27-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 SERVED JUL-19-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JUL-22-2012 ON DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (6 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 (Fee:28.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 AS TO DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCLUSKEY, SEAN TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 LIN, YU-CHIN MELISSA TRUSTEES OF THE MCCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST DATED 1/23/12 AS TO DEFENDANT GALLIC, GORDON THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CLAIRE CSILLAG, AN UNMARRIED WOMAN BELEIVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ALEXANDER M. WEYAND (SBN 108147) S i e REBECCA M. HOBERG (SBN 224086) WEYAND LAW FIRM, P.C. C

o &7.

531 Howard Street,gai{%t Floor T o

San Francisco, CA 5 CLERK O T oy i

Telephone: (415) 536-2800 ay. =R gk THE COURT

Facsimile: (415) 536-2818 "“”“f:”‘*w'ufl““'tyflk = Eaty Clar

Attorneys for Plaintiffs SEAN McCLUSKEY AND

YU-CHUN MELISSA LIN, TRUSTEES of the

McCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST, dated

January 23, 2012

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

SEAN McCLUSKEY AND YU-CHUN

MELISSA LIN, TRUSTEES of the

McCLUSKEY AND LIN FAMILY TRUST, Case No. CGC-12-522211

dated January 23, 2012,

Plaintiffs, PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF

MOTION AND MOTION FOR

VS. QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT

FOLLOWING EXPIRATION OF

GORDON GALLIC, the testate and intestate DATE FOR ANY “UNKNOWN

successors of Claire Csillag also known as DEFENDANTS” TO RESPOND TO Alice Claire Csillag, an unmarried woman, COMPLAINT SERVED BY believed to be deceased, and all persons PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS;

claiming by, through, or under such decedent

and all {)ersons unknown, claiming any legal or | SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM

equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

the property described in the complaint adverse | DECLARATIONS OF REBECCA M.

to Plaintiff's title, or any cloud on Plaintiff's HOBERG AND ALEXANDER M.

title thereto; and DOES 1 TO 100, inclusive. WEYAND; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; PROPOSED

Defendants. JUDGMENT [CCP §§ 764.010 & 764.020]

Hearing

Date: April 8, 2014 Time: 9:00 a.m. Dept.: 514

Complaint Filed: July 9, 2012 Tral Date: None

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 1

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2211
Case Title:SEAN MCCLUSKEY et al VS. GORDON GALLIC et al
Court Date:MAY-28-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion By Pltfs For Judgment On The Pleadings On The Ansdwer Of Defts;
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, May 28, 2013, Line 12, PLAINTIFFs SEAN MCCLUSKEY and YU-CHIN LIN's Motion By Plaintiffs For Judgment On The Pleadings On The Ansdwer Of Defendants.Granted. No opposition filed. In their answer, Defendants Jacques Csillag, Marie-Jose Csillag, Romain Parrault and Sophie Parrault affirm that they do not claim any right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the subject property. (Answer, 2, 16.) The Court will sign the proposed order submitted with the motion. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******2211
Case Title:SEAN MCCLUSKEY et al VS. GORDON GALLIC et al
Court Date:NOV-27-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn For Judgmnt On The Pleadings
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, November 27, 2012, Line 24. PLAINTIFFS SEAN MCCLUSKEY, YU-CHIN LIN'S Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings. The motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted as to Gordon Gallic without leave to amend. No opposition was filed. It appears premature to enter judgment, however, since it appears that there are other defendants who have been served but have yet to appear in the case. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEYAND, ALEXANDER MICHAEL