This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 09:31:03 (UTC).

SCOTT HASKINS VS. KAREN FRANCIS et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2010 SCOTT HASKINS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KAREN FRANCIS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4294

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASKINS, SCOTT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

1011 GREEN STREET, LLC

DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1 TO 10

NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

FRED PAVLOW CO., INC., DBA ADD-A-GARAGE

NELSON, HAROLD

THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR

FRANCIS, KAREN

FRED PAVLOW CO., INC. DBA ADD-A-GARAGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

1011 GREEN ST LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendants

GIDDINGS, MALIN

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE

FRED PAVLOW CO., INC., DBA ADD-A-GARAGE

NELSON, HAROLD

MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR

ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

FRANCIS, KAREN

FRED PAVLOW CO., INC. DBA ADD-A-GARAGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1-20

VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. DBA COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE)

MOES 1-50

FRED PAULOW CO., INC. DBA ADD-A-GARAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTER, DAVID MARK

Attorney at DAVID M. PORTERATTORNEY AT LAW

One Sansome Street, Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWAR, RAMSEY F.

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery St., 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2584

DZIESINSKI, KENNETH LEE

Attorney at BRAGG & KULUVAEMBARCADERO CTR. WEST

275 Battery St., Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

GUICHARD, MATTHEW P.

Attorney at GUICHARD, TENG & PORTELLO, APCSUTTER SQUARE

1800 Sutter Street, Ste 730

Concord, CA 94520

ASIANO, ANN MARILYNNE

Attorney at BRADLEY,CURLEY,ASIANO,BARABEE ABEL & KOWALSKI A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1100 Larkspur Landing Circle,, Suite 200

Larkspur, CA 94939

COLOMBATTO, PAUL RICHARD

Attorney at STRATMAN, PATTERSON & HUNTER

505 14Th Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94612

LUTHER, ROBERT STEVENSON

Attorney at LAW DIVISION OF NRT INC

12657 Alcosta Blvd Ste500

San Ramon, CA 94583

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT FRANCIS, KAREN

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND X-COMPL FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT FRANCIS, KAREN (Fee:40.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND DESIGNATE MATTER COMPLEX FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR SERVED MAR-13-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON CROSS DEFENDANT FRED PAULOW CO., INC. DBA ADD-A-GARAGE

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO HAROLD NELSON'S DEMURRER TO KAREN FRANCIS X-COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF NEIL P. CHERUBIN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF FOR DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION CONTAINED THEREIN FILED BY DEFENDANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING HAROLD G. NELSON'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED SEP-21-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON CROSS DEFENDANT GIDDINGS, MALIN

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY: NOTCIE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; MEMO OF P&A FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GIDDINGS, MALIN VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. DBA COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANCIS, KAREN

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR ON FEB-24-2012

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-10-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 5/8/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY MCLAUGHLIN, ARTHUR ON FEB-24-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANCIS, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STATEMENT RE STAUTS OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT NELSON, HAROLD GORDON, IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF HAROLD NELSON FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FRED PAVLOW CO., INC. DBA ADD-A-GARAGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF A NEW TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-05-2012 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON JUN-10-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON OCT-23-2012 IN 206, DEFENDANT HAROLD GORDON NELSON IND. AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD GORDON NELSON YEAR 2002 REVOCABLE TRUST'S MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL IS GRANTED. THE TRIAL DATE OF 11/5/12 IS CONTINUED TO 6/10/13 IN DEPT. 206 AT 9:30 AM. PLAINTIFF IS TO GIVE NOTICE. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-17-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 503. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HASKINS, SCOTT JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-19-2011 AT 3:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 611. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-06-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-04-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HASKINS, SCOTT SERVED OCT-13-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HASKINS, SCOTT AS TO DEFENDANT FRANCIS, KAREN DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-04-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-29-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-17-2011 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less