This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 12:46:09 (UTC).

SCOTT BYRUM ET AL VS. CRANE CO.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SCOTT BYRUM filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CRANE CO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6811

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

Defendants

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

CRANE CO.

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

CLEAVINGER, MARC D.

Attorney at CLEAVINGER APLC

7825 Fay Avenue Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

VUCINICH, JEFFERY MICHAEL

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, VUCINICH, BEEMAN AND SCHELEY

1111 Bayhill Drive, Ste 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

YUEN, NICOLE BROWN

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, P.L.L.P.

2185 N. California Blvd, Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, GOETZ, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

1340 Treat Boulevard, Suite 120

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT BWIP, INC., and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries, erroneously s

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64682094) FILED BY DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL AND ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC. ASSOC

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 64631476): CLEAVINGER, MARC D. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL AND ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.S ANS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631476) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

Proof of Service for UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL and ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631353), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

Proof of Service for CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631353), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

ANSWER OF CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC., a dissolved California corpor

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64595343) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service for CRANE CO.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577656), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DECLARATION OF SCOTT BYRUM UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32

DECLARATION OF SCOTT BYRUM UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 64503420) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET /NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO. BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC. CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0920211F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64682094) FILED BY DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC. (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : S0220127F015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 64631476): CLEAVINGER, MARC D. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631476) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631353), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631353), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B7120108F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64595343) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577656), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SCOTT BYRUM UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 64503420) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET /NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819C05F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYRUM, SCOTT AS SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, STEPHEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED BYRUM, CAROL AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF RAYMOND BYRUM DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO. BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC. CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BW/IP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRANE CO. is a litigant