This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 12:02:08 (UTC).

SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2005 SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0733

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALL AMERICAN TILE AND TERRAZZO, INC., A CALIFORNIA

MOES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

S & L PAYTON, INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

J.C METAL SPECIALISTS, INC.

J.C. METAL SPECIALISTS

BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS DOE 1)

NORTH BAY WATERPROOFING, INC.

PEERLESS PRODUCTS, INC.

ZOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

SERVICE LATHING COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

A TOUCH OF CLASS PAINTING & DECORATING

J.C. METAL SPECIALISTS, INC.

S & L PAYTON, INC.

DOES 1-30 INCLUSVIE (FROM CASE #445756)

DAVIDSON PLASTERING, INC.

BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC.

JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

J.C METAL SPECIALISTS, INC.

J.C. METAL SPECIALISTS

NORTH BAY WATERPROOFING, INC.

PEERLESS PRODUCTS, INC.

Cross Plaintiffs

JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION

DAVIDSON PLASTERING, INC.

JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, BENJAMIN A

Attorney at QUADROS & JOHNSON, LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

247 North San Mateo Drive

San Mateo, CA 94401

HASS, PETER AUGUST

Attorney at WATSON, HOFFE & HASS

3700 Barrett Avenue, P.O. Box 5001

Richmond, CA 94805

OLSEN, JEFFREY G

Attorney at FENNELL & OLSEN

90 Blue Ravine Road,Suite 170

Folsom, CA 95630

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WINCHESTER, TIMOTHY FARRELL

Attorney at MCINERNEY & DILLON,P.C.

1999 Harrison St, Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94612-4700

CAPPELLUTI, LISA M.

Attorney at LORBER, GREENFIELD & POLITO, LLP

150 Post St., Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 600

San Deigo, CA 92101

GILL, THOMAS R

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

LAST, JR., WILLIAM CORNELIUS

Attorney at LAST & FAORO

520 North El Camino Real, #430

San Mateo, CA 94402

ELGUINDY, JOSEPH M

Attorney at GREEN & HALL, APC

2999 Douglas Blvd Ste 315

Roseville, CA 95661

BORBELY, THOMAS E.

Attorney at STONE & ASSOCIATES, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road, Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

PANCHAL, JITESH G.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & WAGNER

2633 Camino Ramon, Ste 210

San Ramon, CA 94583

SCHELEY, LLOYD THEODORE

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, BELLAGAMBA AND VUCINICH A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1111 Bayhill Drive, Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 600

San Deigo, CA 92101

GILL, THOMAS R

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

LAST, JR., WILLIAM CORNELIUS

Attorney at LAST & FAORO

520 North El Camino Real, #430

San Mateo, CA 94402

ELGUINDY, JOSEPH M

Attorney at GREEN & HALL, APC

2999 Douglas Blvd Ste 315

Roseville, CA 95661

BORBELY, THOMAS E.

Attorney at STONE & ASSOCIATES, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road, Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

PANCHAL, JITESH G.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & WAGNER

2633 Camino Ramon, Ste 210

San Ramon, CA 94583

SCHELEY, LLOYD THEODORE

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, BELLAGAMBA AND VUCINICH A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1111 Bayhill Drive, Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

JOHNSON, BENJAMIN A

Attorney at QUADROS & JOHNSON, LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

247 North San Mateo Drive

San Mateo, CA 94401

HASS, PETER AUGUST

Attorney at WATSON, HOFFE & HASS

3700 Barrett Avenue, P.O. Box 5001

Richmond, CA 94805

OLSEN, JEFFREY G

Attorney at FENNELL & OLSEN

90 Blue Ravine Road,Suite 170

Folsom, CA 95630

GREEN, ROBERT L

Attorney at GREEN & HALL APC

2999 Douglas Blvd. Ste. 220

Roseville, CA 95661-4216

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

KAZAN, PHILIP YVES

MARTIN, SUZANNE M.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

SCHRAM, STEPHEN ALAN

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JONES, CRAIG STANTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street Ste 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

RODMAN, JORDAN A.

Attorney at DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

37 Old Courthouse Square, Suie 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

BALLATI, DEBORAH SCHAFER

Attorney at FARELLA, BRAUN & MARTEL

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DOES 1 THROUGH 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-23-2005 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-24-2005 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-08-2005 (Fee:295.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN (Fee:292.20)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Fee:292.20)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN DOES 1 TO 20

CROSS COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN DOES 1 TO 20 UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TO SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER, L.P.'S FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SASCO ELECTRIC ROES 100 THROUGH 120

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-23-2005 CONTINUED TO NOV-04-2005 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212,. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TO THE X-COMPLAINT OF JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION AGAINST SASCO ELECTRIC, ET AL.) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-08-2006 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-17-2006 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 501. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-01-2006 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-04-2005 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-17-2006 CONTINUED TO APR-19-2006 AT 2:30 PM IN 501

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-08-2006 CONTINUED TO APR-26-2006 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-19-2006 CONTINUED TO AUG-30-2006 AT 1:30 PM IN 501

147 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2010
  • REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-04-2010 - DISMISSALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-16-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENRTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ORDER ON JAMES E. ROBERT-OBAYASHI CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS SASCO'S COMPLAINT, SASCO'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FRIVOLOUS TACTICS AND VIOLATING SPECIAL CONDITIONS, AND THE SCHEDULED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-05-2010 - PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTIES (STIPULATED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF JOHNSON BENJAMIN A ON JUL-23-2010 THROUGH JUL-30-2010 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-05-2010 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 505

    Read MoreRead Less
477 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2005
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY FEDERAL EXPRESS, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED APR-28-2005, MAIL ON DEFENDANT OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN DOES 1 TO 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED MAY-11-2005, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED MAY-25-2005, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SASCO ELECTRIC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JAMES E.ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN SAN FRANCISCO CARE CENTER,L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DOES 1 THROUGH 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-23-2005 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-24-2005 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-08-2005 (Fee:295.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH BAY WATERPROOFING,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where SASCO is a litigant