This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/02/2016 at 05:57:09 (UTC).

Sarlo-millstein, Susannah Vs Sarlo, Gabriella

Case Summary

On 07/23/2002 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Sarlo-millstein Susannah against Sarlo Gabriella in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8015

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2002

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarlo-millstein, Susannah

Defendant

Sarlo, Gabriella

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2003
  • EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SARLO, GABRIELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SARLO-MILLSTEIN, SUSANNAH RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SARLO, GABRIELLA $650.00 PRINCIPAL, $95.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $745.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED ON DEFENDANT SARLO, GABRIELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • TRIAL RESET TO SEP-27-2002 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2002
  • SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION AUG-23-2002, OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,681.42 FILED BY SARLO-MILLSTEIN, SUSANNAH AS TO DEFENDANT SARLO, GABRIELLA ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR AUG-23-2002 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less