This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 04:29:02 (UTC).

SANDRA TEIXEIRA VS. THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2012 SANDRA TEIXEIRA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4000

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEIXEIRA, SANDRA

Defendants

JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, (A CALIFORNIA ENTITY)

DOES 1 TO 100

THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORGAN, LAWRENCE A.

Attorney at EQUALITY LAWYERS, LLP

405 San Anselmo Avenue

San Anselmo, CA 94960

Defendant Attorneys

LENKOV, JEFFREY M

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

PERRY, JESSICA RACHEL

ROTH, DAVID V.

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California St Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, (A CALIFORNIA ENTITY) JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-06-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-05-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-22-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA SERVED NOV-01-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, (A CALIFORNIA ENTITY)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA SERVED OCT-21-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION (Fee:900.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LENKOV, JEFFREY M SUBSTITUTED FOR PERRY, JESSICA RACHEL AS ATTORNEY FOR JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY.: ROTH, DAVID V. SUBSTITUTED FOR LENKOV, JEFFREY M AS ATTORNEY FOR THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-26-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-06-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-26-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 8/22/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-26-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-06-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY.: ROTH, DAVID V. SUBSTITUTED FOR LENKOV, JEFFREY M AS ATTORNEY FOR THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LENKOV, JEFFREY M SUBSTITUTED FOR PERRY, JESSICA RACHEL AS ATTORNEY FOR JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • POS OF ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA SERVED OCT-21-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA SERVED NOV-01-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, (A CALIFORNIA ENTITY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEIXEIRA, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT THE GYMBOREE CORPORATION, (A CALIFORNIA ENTITY) JUAREZ-PALACIO, ERIKA DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-06-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-05-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-22-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less