This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 18:02:17 (UTC).

SANDRA BARKER VS. DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 SANDRA BARKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0922

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION

DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAINS, MANPREET S.

Attorney at THE BAINS FIRM

2600 Central Ave., Suite G

Union City, CA 94587

WEISS, WILLIAM EDWARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. WEISS

140 Geary St, 7Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorney

GOULDING, LINDSAY A.

Porter Scott, 350 University Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

 

Court Documents

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-28-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-26-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-05-2022

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) TO PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68018457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED DIGNITY HEALTH COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $1305; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5222913F018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68018457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED DIGNITY HEALTH COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH; Fee: $1305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210013163), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED AUG-05-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) TO PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B7122727F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210012211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARKER, SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A MERCY MEDICAL CENTER MERCED COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-28-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-26-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-05-2022; Fee: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOULDING, LINDSEY A