This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:41:12 (UTC).

SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY VS. ROBEA NEISHA CROCKETT et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBEA NEISHA CROCKETT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4175

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94133

CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

San Francisco, CA 94133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, BILL

Attorney at SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL

1815 Egbert Avenue, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94124

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA (Fee:IFP)

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY AS TO DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:EXEMPT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

JUDEM

DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SERVED FEB-05-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY HEARING SET FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Settlement Hearing

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR MAR-14-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • REMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-18-2013 - CASE SETTLED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-14-2013 - CASE SETTLED BEFORE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PER EMAIL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. TRIAL DATE OF MAR-18-2013 VACATED. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR MAR-14-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY HEARING SET FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF REPORTER FEE PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF REPORTER FEE GRANTED FOR CASES REPORTED BY A COURT EMPLOYED REPORTER ONLY, PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SERVED FEB-05-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY AS TO DEFENDANT CROCKETT, ROBEA NEISHA DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less