Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/18/2018 at 05:26:52 (UTC).

SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION ET AL VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1486

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

LAM, RICHARD

SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION

LAM, PEGGY

SULLIVAN, PATRICK

TERPSTRA, SYLVIA

CHINESE GOSPEL CHURCH

RUAN, TU LIN

CHENG, WING FUN

Defendants and Respondents

GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN , GENERAL MANAGER, RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

SNIDER, KEVIN T.

Attorney at PACIFIC JUSTICE INSTITUTE

212 9Th Street, Suite 208

Oakland, CA 95827

STEELEY, TARA M.

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSCITY HALL, ROOM 234

1 Dr. Carleton B.Goodlett Pl.

San Francisco, CA 941024682

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

SNIDER, KEVIN T.

Attorney at PACIFIC JUSTICE INSTITUTE

212 9Th Street, Suite 208

Oakland, CA 95827

Plaintiff, Defendant and Respondent Attorney

STEELEY, TARA M.

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSCITY HALL, ROOM 234

1 Dr. Carleton B.Goodlett Pl.

San Francisco, CA 941024682

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59695890)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59463903) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION LAM, RICHARD LAM, PEGGY SULLIVAN, PATRICK TERPSTRA, SYLVIA CHINESE GOSPEL CHURCH RUAN, TU LIN CHENG, WING FUN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

EXHIBIT B TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEF

EXHIBIT B TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND PHILIP ALAN GINSBURG TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 59372977) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CITY

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59372977) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND PHILIP ALAN GINSBURG TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (EXTENDED TO JULY 13, 2016)

DECLARATION OF TARA M. STEELEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR

DECLARATION OF TARA M. STEELEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND PHILIP ALAN GINSBURG TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59206380) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICAITON FOR ORER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 59127497) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Change of Address - Kevin Snider

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 60688548) FILED BY ATTORNEY SNIDER, KEVIN T.

RESPONDENT S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

RESPONDENT S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59774982) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN , GENERAL MANAGER, RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-16-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

EXHIBIT A, PART 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRE

EXHIBIT A, PART 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND PHILIP ALAN GINSBURG TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 59372977) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59206380) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 59133467) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59066750), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION SERVED APR-14-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF CONRAD REYNOLDSON TO APPEAR AS COU

APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59033529) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION LAM, RICHARD LAM, PEGGY SULLIVAN, PATRICK TERPSTRA, SYLVIA

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • Payment : COSTS ON PREPARING APPEAL; Amount : $325; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R1317530A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Amount : $100; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0616A14A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W8116804R018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W8116804M017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : R7816629S002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R7816629M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : R6416609C026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R6416609M025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Payment : APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R7816520P008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : B4916513F024

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICAITON FOR ORER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 59127497) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • FEE PAID FOR STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND PHILIP ALAN GINSBURG TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59127497) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TARA M. STEELEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59127497) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59127497) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59077511), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION LAM, RICHARD LAM, PEGGY SULLIVAN, PATRICK TERPSTRA, SYLVIA SERVED APR-14-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN , GENERAL MANAGER, RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59066750), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION SERVED APR-14-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59033529) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION LAM, RICHARD LAM, PEGGY SULLIVAN, PATRICK TERPSTRA, SYLVIA (Fee:$500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TARA M. STEELEY RE GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2); SEEKING AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION (TRANSACTION ID # 59001483) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS GENERAL MANAGER OF RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHINESE CHRISTIAN UNION LAM, RICHARD LAM, PEGGY SULLIVAN, PATRICK TERPSTRA, SYLVIA AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO GINSBURG, PHILIP ALAN , GENERAL MANAGER, RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-14-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-13-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-22-2016 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less