This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 08:53:40 (UTC).

SAMUEL TAM VS. KAR TUNG JOE SEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2016 SAMUEL TAM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAR TUNG JOE SEE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0792

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAU, MICHAEL L.

Attorney at THE MAU LAW FIRM AKA LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL L. MAU

950 Harrison St.,Ste 213

San Francisco, CA 94107-1078

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

HUDSON, GEOFFREY RALPH

Attorney at GEOFFREY R. HUDSON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 2547

Napa, CA 94558

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019193), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED APR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58910263), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-19-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

General Denial

GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16103005) FILED BY DEFENDANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY AND REIMBURSEMENT

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16103005) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543) AS TO DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-15-2016, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-03-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-03-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-11-2016 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019193), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED APR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58910263), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-19-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16103005) FILED BY DEFENDANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16103005) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543) AS TO DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-15-2016, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58851543), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TAM, SAMUEL AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT SEE, KAR TUNG JOE AN INDIVIDUAL DBA JOE SEE CONSTRUCTION BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-03-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-03-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-11-2016 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0792
Case Title:SAMUEL TAM VS. KAR TUNG JOE SEE ET AL
Court Date:NOV-08-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES
Rulings:Set for hearing on the Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, November 8, 2017, line 4. PLAINTIFF SAMUEL TAM'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES. Off calendar for department 302. The moving party filed an amended notice scheduling this motion to be heard in department 514 on November 9, 2017. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******0792
Case Title:SAMUEL TAM VS. KAR TUNG JOE SEE ET AL
Court Date:DEC-06-2016 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Admit And Compel Discovery Responses Against Kar Tung Joe See, And For Monetary Sanctions;
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, December 6, 2016, LINE 4PLAINTIFF SAMUEL TAM'S Motion To Admit And Compel Discovery Responses Against Kar Tung Joe See, And For Monetary Sanctions;Pro Tem Judge Steven Stein, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery and deem facts set forth in his Request for Admissions to be deemed true, is unopposed and granted. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production and Form Interrogatories within twenty days of service of a copy of this Order with Notice of Entry. Sanctions are awarded in the sum of $750.00 to paid within the aforesaid twenty days.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to sbs@knoxricksen.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/JPT


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hudson, Geoffrey Ralph