This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 09:25:26 (UTC).

SALVACION CARINO et al VS. GREENPOINT FUNDING INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2010 SALVACION CARINO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GREENPOINT FUNDING INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9704

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARINO, SALVACION

CARINO, CYRUS-LORD

Defendants

DOES 1-250, INCLUSIVE

EJL INVESTMENT INC.

GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC

GREENPOINT FUNDING INC.

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISHER, MARC ALAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARC C FISHER

9580 Oak Avenue Parkway #15

Folsom, CA 95630

SCOTT, SANDRA GAYLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANDRA G. SCOTT

255 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

STRAUS, DOUGLAS CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS ATTORNEYS AT LAW

2033 North Main St. Ste. 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SORICH, JOHN M.

Attorney at ALVARADOSMITH, APC

1 Macarthur Place, Ste 200

Santa Ana, CA 92707

YOO, SUNG-MIN

Attorney at ADOMO, YOSS, ALVARADO, & SMITH

1 Macarthur Place, Ste 200

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SCOTT, DAVID C.

Attorney at MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

1770 Fourth Ave.

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD AS TO DEFENDANT GREENPOINT FUNDING INC. EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. WELLS FARGO BANK NA EJL INVESTMENT INC. DOES 1-250, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-08-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-09-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-23-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GREENPOINT FUNDING INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-17-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-20-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD AS TO DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. EJL INVESTMENT INC. DOES 1-250, INCLUSIVE GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-08-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-28-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-28-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-08-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GREENPOINT FUNDING INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-08-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE AND SERVE ORDER RE DEMURRER AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 CONTINUED TO AUG-12-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE AND SERVE ORDER RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER FEB-25-2011 RULING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-26-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE AND SERVE ORDER RE DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER FEB-25-2011 RULING. THE AUG-12-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR NOV-15-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. SEP-26-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-15-2011 CONTINUED TO JAN-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-19-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISMISSING CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUL-10-2012 AT 2:00PM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-10-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-19-2012 CONTINUED TO JUL-10-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-19-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-19-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-15-2011 CONTINUED TO JAN-19-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • DECLARATION OF TONY J CHENG IN RESPONSE TO SEPT 26,2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR NOV-15-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. SEP-26-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS FILED BY DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. HEARING SET FOR JUL-14-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND INDEX OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC HEARING SET FOR JUL-14-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-20-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-17-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GREENPOINT FUNDING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD SERVED MAY-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARINO, SALVACION CARINO, CYRUS-LORD AS TO DEFENDANT GREENPOINT FUNDING INC. EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. WELLS FARGO BANK NA EJL INVESTMENT INC. DOES 1-250, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-08-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-09-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-23-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9704
Case Title:SALVACION CARINO et al VS. GREENPOINT FUNDING INC. et al
Court Date:FEB-25-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, February 25, 2011, line 8, DEFENDANT GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. OFF CALENDAR PER FEBRUARY 15 DISMISSAL. =(302/LMG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMC MORTGAGE CORP. (EMC) is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant