Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/05/2016 at 05:29:07 (UTC).

SABINO BRITO VS. BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2009 SABINO BRITO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3843

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION)

BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COOPER, SCOTT B.

Attorney at THE COOPER LAW FIRM

2030 Main Street, 13Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

CARTER, ROGER R

Attorney at THE CARTER LAW FIRM

2030 Main Street, Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

COHELAN, TIMOTHY D

Attorney at COHELAN KHOURY & SINGER

605 C Street, Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

WALKER, MICHELLE R

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-26-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-28-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-11-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:920.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED DEC-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) (Fee:920.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-26-2010 CONTINUED TO MAY-07-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS AND STATUS OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION. PARTIES TO CHECK STATUS WITH DEPT. 304. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT

SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-20-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305. MAY-07-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPARTMENT 212 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF 7/23/10 IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 305.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF 7/23/10 IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 305.

MINUTES FOR AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM

MINUTES FOR AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-09-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR - CASE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; NOT REPORTED (305)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD 8/3/10 - CASE WILL BE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS - MATTER IS CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 9, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 304 AS A PROTECTIVE DATE. JUDGE JOHN MUNTER, CLERK KARISSA SHAW, REPORTER RHONDA AQUILINA. (305)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF 7/23/10 IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 3, 2010 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-20-2010 HELD AND CONTINUED TO JUL-23-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN 305, UPON STIPULATION OF COUNSEL. NOTICE WAIVED. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; REPORTER: RHONDA AQUILINA (305)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • JOINT INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-20-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305. MAY-07-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPARTMENT 212 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-26-2010 CONTINUED TO MAY-07-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS AND STATUS OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION. PARTIES TO CHECK STATUS WITH DEPT. 304. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) (Fee:920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED DEC-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRITO, SABINO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-26-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-28-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-11-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER ROGER R. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER SCOTT P. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHELAN TIMOTHY D.