This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:49:32 (UTC).

RUSSELL UTTERBACK VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2007 RUSSELL UTTERBACK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4276

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.

AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC.

SIMPSON PAPER COMPANY

CRANE CO.

BLUE DIAMOND GROWERS

W.W. HENRY COMPANY, THE

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.

B.T. MANCINI CO., INC.

THE W. W. HENRY COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

NAPA AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA)

CHASE CHEVROLET CO., INC.

CARRIER CORPORATION

ECKLUND INSULATION COMPANY

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

Other Attorneys

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

WATERS, DAVID HENRY

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

LINDBLOM, DEBORAH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DEBORAH LINDBLOM

1345 Vicente Street

San Francisco, CA 94116

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY???S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16033909) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Nestle USA, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16235960) FILED BY DEFENDANT NESTLE USA, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Answer to Complaint-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16288349) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service as to Yale Industrial Products

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21453756) FILED BY DEFENDANT YALE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS, INC.

MEMORANDU OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 29145576) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC. SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS DOE 1002

DEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES

MOTION IN LIMINE # 9 TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 31333410) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE W. W. HENRY COMPANY

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.a??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF BOOKS WRITTEN ABOUT THE BECHTEL FAMILY

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF BOOKS WRITTEN ABOUT THE BECHTEL FAMILY (TRANSACTION ID # 31578495) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.a??S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES AND DOCUMENTS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES AND DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31578495) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

Request for Dismissal as to Zurn Industries LLC

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 45300723) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

Answer of Defendant to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint For Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16094328) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16622929) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, THE DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 4 TO BE CHASE CHEVROLET CO., INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1002 TO BE TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

Substitution of Attorney for Defendant B.T. Mancini Co., Inc.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 16991826): SINUNU, JAMES NAJEEB SUBSTITUTED FOR SINUNU, JAMES NAJEEB AS ATTORNEY FOR B.T. MANCINI CO., INC.

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20325473) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOES 15 & 1006 TO BE EX-FME, INC. (FKA FISCHBACH AND MOORE ELECTRIC, INC.)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28499154) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MILLS, INC.

Jury Fees Letter

JURY FEES, TRAN # B4910419J002, TAG # 025821 (TRANSACTION ID # 30604100) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (Fee:150.00)

DEFENDANT BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.S MIL No. 6: To Preclude Evidence Regarding Defendants? Membership In Trade Associations, Or Receipt Of Trade Association Publications, Or Other Constitutionally Protected Activities

MIL NO. 6: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFENDANTS MEMBERSHIP IN TRADE ASSOCIATIONS, OR RECEIPT OF TRADE ASSOCIATION PUBLICATIONS, OR OTHER CONSTITUTIONALLY PROTECTED ACTIVITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 30951043) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.

Request for Dismissal - Defendant Monterey Mechanical Company

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36385700) AS TO DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice by Asbestos Corporation Limited

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 48572646) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

368 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-18-2013. DISMISSAL FILED 4/9/13. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 51699241)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON FEB-21-2013 TO APR-18-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; REPORTER: CINDY GARIS OF AIKEN WELCH, CSR #9402 (510) 451-1580.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49274323) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 48572646) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON FEB-21-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH, REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT THE REMAINING DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY'S BANKRUPTCY STAY HAS BEEN LIFTED AND TRIAL DATE IS TO BE SET AT THE NEXT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 45300723) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44129359) AS TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR ON AUG-19-2011. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 206 ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. THE TRIAL ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE STEWART IS WITHDRAWN (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
412 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. H.J. HEINZ COMPANYS OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 16111382) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.J. HEINZ COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16111382) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.J. HEINZ COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16111382) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.J. HEINZ COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16094328) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16094328) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16084918) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16033909) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF UTTERBACK, RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UTTERBACK, RUSSELL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less