This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:41:24 (UTC).

RUSSELL C ROBERTS JR VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2007 RUSSELL C ROBERTS JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4248

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NIBCO INC.

FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

DOES 1-800

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

CRANE CO.

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES,LLC

OWENS-ILLINOIS

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

CARRIER CORPORATION

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

ENPRO INDUSTRIES

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

PARKER HANNIFIN

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

One Market Street, Steuart Tower, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Rapid-American Corporations Answer to plaintiffs unverified

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15586232) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF J. RAE LOVKO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF J. RAE LOVKO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT CRANE CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17751872) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C

PLAINTIFF???S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES INOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NIBCO INC.???S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF???S EXPERT WITNESS KENNETH COHEN TO PRODUCE HIS ???NAVY FILE??? AT DEPOSITION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 17842200) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS NEXIS FILE & SERVE OF DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY???S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS??? MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANT???S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE, CUSTODIAN OF RECORD AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF MOLLY MCKAY AND EXHIBITS A TO I

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS NEXIS FILE SERVE OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANT'S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE, CUSTODIAN OF RECORD AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF MOLLY MCKAY AND EXHIBITS A TO I (TRANSACTION ID # 17972021) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PLAINTIFF???S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS??? MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING CO-WORKERS

PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING CO-WORKERS (TRANSACTION ID # 18433133) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C

DECLARATION OF KATHERINE J. FRIDAY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS??? MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING CO-WORKERS

DECLARATION OF KATHERINE J. FRIDAY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING CO-WORKERS (TRANSACTION ID # 18489412) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FOR THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY???S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FOR MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO GOODYEAR CANADA, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 18542735) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Page Line Designations (Goodyear)

PAGE LINE DESIGNATIONS (GOODYEAR) (TRANSACTION ID # 19141414) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Request for dismissal as to defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19458582) AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

PLAINTIFF???S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON SAID MOTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON SAID MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 17554099) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C (Fee:40.00)

Exhibit E

EXHIBIT E (TRANSACTION ID # 17677211) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL RE: MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17677211) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

DEFENDANT NIBCO INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS KENNETH COHEN TO PRODUCE HIS NAVY FILE AT DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS KENNETH COHEN TO PRODUCE HIS NAVY FILE AT DEPOSITION, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17779111) FILED BY DEFENDANT NIBCO INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-03-2008 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS??? OBJECTIONS TO PLANTIFFS??? EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

OBJECTIONS TO PLANTIFFS' EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17790149) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

MIL#15 motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Kenneth Cohen

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 17816128) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DECLARATION OF FERLIN P. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF CARRIER CORPORATION???S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION REGARDING CARRIER AIR CONDITIONING OR REFRIGERATION GASKETS

DECLARATION OF FERLIN P. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF MOT IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION REGARDING CARRIER AIR CONDITIONING OR REFRIGERATION GASKETS (TRANSACTION ID # 18503232) FILED BY DEFENDANT CARRIER CORPORATION

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE VIA COURIER

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE VIA COURIER (TRANSACTION ID # 18574918) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice as to the Complaint as to Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53297177) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS

595 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53297177) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33642123) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32935277) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32357611) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31233149) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. AND/OR WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS), AND/OR WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22140456) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21966302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY $25,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $1,451.66 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $26,451.66, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • EXTRA COURT REPORT FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:1511.32)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20724919) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
730 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15637032) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 15621680) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15621680) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15621680) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15586232) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15578400) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15578331) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS JR, RUSSELL C AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-800 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less