This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:18:26 (UTC).

RUDOLPH HANNA VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2007 RUDOLPH HANNA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4107

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNA, RUDOLPH

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

YARWAY CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RILEY POWER, INC.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORP. PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

POLLACK, DEAN

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BLOMQUIST, SONJA ELIZABETH

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery St. 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 14973869) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15068759) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION ON HEARING BY COMMI

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 15068759) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

POWER BOILER SALES, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20460645) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF POWER BOILERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF POWER BOILERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20460645) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWER BOILER SALES, INC.

CONTINUING EXHIBITS D-F TO THE DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - Hanna, Rudolph SFSC 274107

CONTINUING EXHIBITS D-F TO THE DECL OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20575033) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Exhibit D1

EXHIBIT D1 (TRANSACTION ID # 20576646) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Exhibit D2

EXHIBIT D2 (TRANSACTION ID # 20576646) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 20576646) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Exhibit C to Index of Documentary Evidence in Support of Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT C TO INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20579103) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

Exhibit H to Index of Documentary Evidence in Support of Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT H TO INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20579103) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21558798) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANNA, RUDOLPH

DECLARATION OF FRANCESCA CEDOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF FRANCESCA CEDOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21592177) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT VELAN VALVE CORP.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT VELAN VALVE CORP.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21681452) FILED BY DEFENDANT VELAN VALVE CORPORATION (Fee:40.00)

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request For Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25068119) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY TERRY CORPORATION OF CONNECTICUT TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO. SCHLAGE LOCK COMPANY

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Peerless Industries, Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33626641) AS TO DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37714392)

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37714392)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36901166) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-17-2010 TO JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33626641) AS TO DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS OF SEP-13-2010 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON DEC-17-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-21-2010 CONTINUED TO SEP-23-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN 603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-09-2010 CONTINUED TO SEP-21-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN 603

    Read MoreRead Less
298 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14718001) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14702504) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 14677609) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14677609) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 14599579) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14599579) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14599579) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANNA, RUDOLPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANNA, RUDOLPH AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less