This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:42:42 (UTC).

ROY BROZ et al VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2007 ROY BROZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4251

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROZ, ROY

Defendants

SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

CHRYSLER LLC

DOES 1-800

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

AMCORD INC

SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.

CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

MORTON & SON OF CALIFORNIA INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR- IN-INTEREST COMPANY

PAREXLAHABRA, INC.

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

ADAMS, BARBARA ROSE

Attorney at ADAMS NYE SINUNU BRUNI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny St., 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOX, GERARD P.

Attorney at LINER YANKELEVITS SUNSHINE & REGENSTREIF LLP

199 Fremont St, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

BERKES, ROBERT H

Attorney at BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

WOO, RHONDA L

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94948

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROZ, ROY BROZ, ADEALINE AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ADVOCATE MINLES LIMITED AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR- IN-INTEREST COMPANY AMCORD INC DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Defendant Rapid-American Corporations Answer to Unverified Complaint f

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15415825) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Answer to Complaint For Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium (Asbest

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15456547) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOCO WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15487424) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15487424) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

Defendant International Paper Companys Answer to Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15501100) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal as to defendant OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., only.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15538669) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINIOS, INC.

DEFENDANT J.T.THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJ

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15552553) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18809638) AS TO DEFENDANT SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED, EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 19259979) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19302550) AS TO DEFENDANT PEPBOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CA.

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20207654) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINIOS, INC.

Dismissal as to Defendant Colonial Sugar & Refining, Ltd. aka CSR, Ltd.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20474324) AS TO DEFENDANT CSR, LTD.

Request for Dismissal for Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, Coltec Industries Inc and Enpro Industries Inc

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20564774) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. ENPRO INDUSTRIES

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Dowman Products, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23448056) AS TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

Request for Dismissal, with prejudice, as to Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd., only, each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31414438) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31665882) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

465 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31665882) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31414438) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23448056) AS TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20564774) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. ENPRO INDUSTRIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20474324) AS TO DEFENDANT CSR, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20207654) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINIOS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19302550) AS TO DEFENDANT PEPBOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED, EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 19259979) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18809638) AS TO DEFENDANT SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17923813) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS ALLIED SIGNAL, INC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
520 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15552553) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15538669) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINIOS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15501100) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15487424) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15487424) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15456547) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOCO WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15415825) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROZ, ROY BROZ, ADEALINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROZ, ROY BROZ, ADEALINE AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ADVOCATE MINLES LIMITED AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR- IN-INTEREST COMPANY AMCORD INC DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less