This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/14/2019 at 13:05:24 (UTC).

ROSS H MOORE VS. EARL G STOKES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by ROSS H MOORE against EARL G STOKES in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4351

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE

ROES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

STOKES, EARL G TRUETEE OF THE EARL G STOKES

STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Judicial Mediation

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL MEDIATION BEFORE JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER. JUDICIAL MEDIATION SET FOR JAN-10-2019 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 306. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Answer to Unverified First Amended Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF EARL G STOKES) (TRANSACTION ID # 100036043) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100055485) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PARTITON OF REAL PROPERTY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035092) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO BIFURCATE TRIAL

STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO BIFURCATE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 62639560) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

Notice of Pending Action for Partition

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FOR PARTITION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038443) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PARTITON OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AN

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035746) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 ROES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AUG-20-2019 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (ENDORSED COPY RETURNED IN SASE)

Notice of Entry of Stipulated Protective Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100054602) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 AS TO DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUETEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

JOINT STATEMENT OF TRIAL TIME LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.8

JOINT STATEMENT OF TRIAL TIME LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.8 (TRANSACTION ID # 62876867) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032236), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 SERVED FEB-18-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

ORDER

ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL

STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR)

STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) (TRANSACTION ID # 100057647) FILED BY STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT OF EARL G. STOKES (TRANSACTION ID # 100036043) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1218B09C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918B06E006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818416F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018215F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AUG-20-2019 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-23-2019 CONTINUED TO AUG-20-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 62885009) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-22-2019 - APPEARANCES AT TRIAL CALL BY ROBERT STALEY, ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFF & MATTHEW GLUCK, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT. COUNSEL REPORTED TO THE COURT THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUL-23-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206/GLW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STATEMENT OF TRIAL TIME LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.8 (TRANSACTION ID # 62876867) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FOR PARTITION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038443) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT OF EARL G. STOKES (TRANSACTION ID # 100036043) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF EARL G STOKES) (TRANSACTION ID # 100036043) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035746) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 ROES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035092) FILED BY DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035092) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 ROES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032236), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 SERVED FEB-18-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, ROSS H TRUETEE OF THE ROSS H MOORE 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 AS TO DEFENDANT STOKES, EARL G TRUSTEE OF THE EARL G STOKES 2003 REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 12/12/03 DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.