This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/14/2019 at 10:53:10 (UTC).

RONALD P. VAN SIEGMAN VS. FCA US, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 RONALD P VAN SIEGMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN, GARRETT L. WONG, RICHARD B. ULMER and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6633

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

GARRETT L. WONG

RICHARD B. ULMER

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

FCA US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUTLER, JACOB

Attorney at STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, APC

1840 Century Park East, Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

GRIBIN-SANCHEZ, MARCY

Attorney at STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES

1840 Century Park East, Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

UNIVERSAL, JON D

Attorney at UNIVERSAL & SHANNON, LLP

2240 Douglas Boulevard, Suite 290

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Declaration of Marcy Gribin-Sanchez in support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte

DECLARATION OF MARCY GRIBIN-SANCHEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100082692) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Trial; Memora

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 100082692) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Notice of Appearance of Counsel

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100081890) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS); PREVAILING PARTY TO SERVE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER.

ORDER

ORDER ; STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

Joint Separate Statement Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Dep

JOINT SEPARATE STATEMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR FCA US, LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 100080363) FILED BY DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEEFENDANT'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED

ORDER

ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Compel The Deposit

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100076804) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Declaration of Nejla Nassirian in Support of Defendant FCA US LLCs Opp

DECLARATION OF EJLA NASSIRIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100076442) FILED BY DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

Separate Statement in Support of Defendant FCA US LLCs Opposition to P

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100076442) FILED BY DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

Defendant FCA US LLCs Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposi

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100076442) FILED BY DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

Plaintiffs Notice of Lodging Transcript

NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPT (TRANSACTION ID # 63358247) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of His Moti

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100074520) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Plaintiffs Separate Statement In Support Of His Motion To Compel The D

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100074520) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Declaration Of Diana Rivero In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Compel

DECLARATION OF DIANA RIVERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100074520) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defenda

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS PERSON MOST QUALIFIED/PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE (TRANSACTION ID # 100074520) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. HEARING SET FOR JUL-12-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519909M008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419614M018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219501M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619430C010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619429M018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1619424M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918B05M011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R6118A15J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518720F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518709F012

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100049643) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100042522) FILED BY DEFENDANT STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041132) FILED BY DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100040565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100040565) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037890), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. SERVED MAY-18-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-18-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037888), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. SERVED MAY-18-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN SIEGMAN, RONALD P. AS TO DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-17-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6633
Case Title:RONALD P. VAN SIEGMAN VS. FCA US, LLC ET AL
Court Date:DEC-03-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff'S Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiff'S Request For Production Of Documents, Set One
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, December 3, 2018, Line 4, PLAINTIFF RONALD VAN SIEGMAN'S Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiff'S Request For Production Of Documents, Set One. Pro Tem Judge Robert Kane, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: No courtesy copies of moving or reply papers provided by Plaintiff. If Plaintiff provide courtesy copies to Dept. 301 by December 11, 2018 (with notice of such to counsel for Defendant) the matter will be continued to December 21, 2018, otherwise the matter is off calendar.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rkane1089@aol.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6633
Case Title:RONALD P. VAN SIEGMAN VS. FCA US, LLC ET AL
Court Date:DEC-21-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff'S Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiff'S Request For Production Of Documents, Set One
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, December 21, 2018, Line 8, PLAINTIFF RONALD VAN SIEGMAN'S Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiff'S Request For Production Of Documents, Set OnePro Tem Judge Paul Renne, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: There will be no tentative ruling on this motion. However, the court is prepared to overrule defendants boiler plate objections, the parties should be prepared to address each request (Nos.7,10,13,15,20,21,23,24,31,33-38,41,43-48,56,65,68-71,75,83 & 90) it's relevance and the adequacy of defendant's initial and supplemental response.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rennepar85@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6633
Case Title:RONALD P. VAN SIEGMAN VS. FCA US, LLC ET AL
Court Date:JUL-12-2019 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendants Person Most Qualified/Person Most Knowledgeable
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, July 12, 2019, Line 4,PLAINTIFF RONALD VAN SIEGMAN's Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendants Person Most Qualified/Person Most Knowledgeable.Pro Tem Judge Adrienne Rogers, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Parties ordered to appear at 10:45 a.m.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to adrienneleight@hotmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6633
Case Title:RONALD P. VAN SIEGMAN VS. FCA US, LLC ET AL
Court Date:AUG-19-2019 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:Further Hearing On Plaintiff Ronald Van Siegman'S Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendants Person Most Qualified/Person Most Knowledgeable (Specially Set At 1:30 Pm Before Judge Pro Tem Adrienne Rogers)(Part 2 Of 2 For Tentative Ruling Only)
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, August 19, 2019, Line 2,Further Hearing On Plaintiff Ronald Van Siegman'S Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendants Person Most Qualified/Person Most Knowledgeable (Specially Set At 1:30 Pm Before Judge Pro Tem Adrienne Rogers)(Part 2 Of 2 For Tentative Ruling Only)Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to adrienneleight@hotmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. (end of part 2 of 2) =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STONERIDGE CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Universal, Jon David