Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:14 (UTC).

RONAK PATEL VS. SHARON MAE WRIGHT et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 RONAK PATEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHARON MAE WRIGHT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8467

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL, RONAK

Defendants

WRIGHT, LAWRENCE

WRIGHT, SHARON MAE

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROUSS, III, JOHN P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN P. STROUSS, III

819 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant Attorney

FEENEY, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at CARBONE, SMOKE, SMITH, BENT & LEONARD

505 14Th Street, Ste 600

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK AS TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-24-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK SERVED MAR-18-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WRIGHT, LAWRENCE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE (Fee:900.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK SERVED MAR-21-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-24-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY FEENEY, THOMAS JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, LAWRENCE (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK SERVED MAR-18-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WRIGHT, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK SERVED MAR-21-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PATEL, RONAK AS TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT, SHARON MAE WRIGHT, LAWRENCE DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less