This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 02:00:45 (UTC).

RODNEY SMITH et al VS. AC AND S, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2006 RODNEY SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AC AND S, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER J. BUSCH, RICHARD A. KRAMER, DONALD S. MITCHELL, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, TOMAR MASON, EVERETT HEWLETT, JAMES L. WARREN and ROBERT L. DONDERO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9361

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PETER J. BUSCH

RICHARD A. KRAMER

DONALD S. MITCHELL

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

TOMAR MASON

EVERETT HEWLETT

JAMES L. WARREN

ROBERT L. DONDERO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, SUSAN

Defendants

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION SII BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

PACCAR INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

CARQUEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.

OPIE, JAMES AND DBA JIM'S AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX, LLC S/I/I TO ABEX CORPORATION

HENLEY'S, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS OWNER OF TENAYA AUTO & TRUCK PARTS

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY

PNEUMO-ABEX CORP SII TO ABEX CORP.

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

CNH AMERICA LLC FKA CASE CORPORATION

MERRIHEW'S AUTO PARTS, INC

DEERE & COMPANY

MORTON INTERNATIONAL INC. A ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY

Other

COHEN, KENNETH

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY INC

100 Pringle Avenue, Ste 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Flr

Long Beach, CA 908015511

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BOMMARITO, SALVATORE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SALVATORE BOMMARITO

78-370 Highway 111, Ste 230

La Quinta, CA 92253

MINOR, TIMOTHY JAMES

Attorney at NICORA & MINOR LLP

P.O. Box 5115

Carmel, CA 939215115

Other Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Other Attorneys

KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A.

Attorney at STOEL RIVES LLP

111 Sutter Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore,, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 908024246

TOWLE, EDMUND J

Attorney at TOWLE DENISON SMITH & TAVERA LLP

10866 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 940613436

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

383 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRY, HOWE, HANEY & RYDER

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1425

Emeryville, CA 94608

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 941052981

WASSERMAN, STEVEN DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

REYEN, KEITH PATRICK

Attorney at OIUM REYEN & PRYOR

220 Montgomery Street, Ste 910

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

POZA, CARLOS K

Attorney at WILD,CAREY AND FIFE

120 Montgomery St 1000

Sf, CA 94104

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS SECOND DOE TO BE QUINN COMPANY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTON INTERNATIONAL INC. A ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF DEBORAH R. ROSENTHAL IN SUPPORT OF KENNETH COHEN???S MO

DECLARATION OF DEBORAH R. ROSENTHAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH OUT-OF-STATE COMMISSION AND OR FOR ORDER TO PROTECT RIGHTS OF NONPARTY WITNESS; AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 11947959) FILED BY OTHER COHEN, KENNETH

Plaintiffs Objection and Reply to defendant Abex LLCs Opposition to Mo

OBJECTION & REPLY TO DEFT ABEX LLCS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO QUASH OUT OF STATE COMMISSIONS AND OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 12098809) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

Declaration of Jeremy D. Huie in Support of Defendant Carlisle Corpora

DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF JEREMY D. HUIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CARLISLE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 12111659) FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLISLE CORPORATION

Exhibits 26 To 28 To The Declaration Of Lauren M. Michals In Support O

EXHIBITS 26 TO 28 TO THE DECLARATION OF LAUREN M. MICHALS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 12111486) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12198282) AS TO DEFENDANT LACEY AUTOMOTIVE PARTS CO.

Exhibits G through H in Support of Pneumo Abex LLCs Ex Parte Applicati

EXHIBITS G THROUGH H IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PNEUMO ABEX LLCS SET TWO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. KWANT (TRANSACTION ID # 12202312) FILED BY DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX, LLC S/I/I TO ABEX CORPORATION

Exhibit B to Declaration of Allison J. Fairchild

EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF ALLISON J. FAIRCHILD (TRANSACTION ID # 12235110) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

Plaintiffs Points & Authorities in Opposition to defendant General Mot

POINTS AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 12241756) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

Exhibit B to the Declaration of Ronald K. Herron - Part 3 of 3

EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF RONALD K. HERRON - PART 3 OF 3 (TRANSACTION ID # 12241756) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

DECLARATION OF RODNEY SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DA

DECLARATION OF RODNEY SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 12245780) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

PLAINTIFFS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND SUPPOR

PLAINTIFFS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 12245780)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 12245780) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE & SERVE

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE & SERVE OF REPLY BRIEF; REQ FOR JUDICIAL NTC; OBJECTION TO PLTF EVIDENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 12283886) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE TO THE AMENDED DECLARATION OF RONALD K. HERRO

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE TO THE AMENDED DECLARATION OF RONALD K. HERRON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 12291231) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

Exhibit 37 to DECLARATION OF LYNN R. FIORENTINO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

EXHIBIT 37 TO DECL OF LYNN R. FIORENTINO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 12293507) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

Exhibit 38 to DECLARATION OF LYNN R. FIORENTINO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

EXHIBIT 38 TO DECL OF LYNN R. FIORENTINO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 12293507) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

320 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1606C06M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1606C06M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1006905M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1406901M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B8206829M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1006825M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B8206822M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W5506822M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5206818M006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5206818M003

    Read MoreRead Less
477 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE CARQUEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS THIRD DOE TO BE PENINSULA AUTO PARTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FIRST DOE TO BE CNH AMERICA LLC FKA CASE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS SECOND DOE TO BE QUINN COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, RODNEY SMITH, SUSAN AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S, INC. THREE HUNDRED FIRST DOE THROUGH NINE HUNDREDTH DOE , INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-14-2007 (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENLEY INDIVIDUALLY AND CARL DBA CITYONE PARTNERS ASSOCIATI is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTON INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC is a litigant