This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 04:09:45 (UTC).

ROCIO GUARNIZ VS. CALVERT M. JANG et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2013 ROCIO GUARNIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALVERT M JANG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9727

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARNIZ, ROCIO

Defendants

JANG & ASSOCIATES

JANG, CALVERT M.

DOES 1 THRU 25, INCL.

CALVERT M. JANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SOLE ENTERPRISE

JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN V.

Attorney at LADVA LAW FIRM

530 Jackson Street,, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

HARTLEY, CARLA J.

Attorney at DILLINGHAM & MURPHY, LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO AS TO DEFENDANT JANG, CALVERT M. JANG & ASSOCIATES DOES 1 THRU 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-20-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-06-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO SERVED MAY-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JANG & ASSOCIATES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT JANG, CALVERT M.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALVERT M. JANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SOLE ENTERPRISE JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES) (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALVERT M. JANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SOLE ENTERPRISE JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-19-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-21-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-09-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 612 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER KEVIN COLEMAN

Notice of Reassignment of Settlement Conference Officer

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-09-2014 AT 08:30 AM. CASE IS REASSIGNED TO CONFERENCE OFFICER DAVID COMMINS. **CONFERENCE IS ALSO MOVED TO DEPARTMENT 212**

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-09-2014 NOT HELD AND REMOVED. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (0.5)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-12-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-30-2014 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-12-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Apr-14-2014 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-14-2014 Case Settled - Set For Crc 3.1385 Hrg On Aug-12-14 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 212; Judge Name: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-09-2014 NOT HELD AND REMOVED. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (0.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-19-2014 - CASE SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-09-2014 AT 08:30 AM. CASE IS REASSIGNED TO CONFERENCE OFFICER DAVID COMMINS. **CONFERENCE IS ALSO MOVED TO DEPARTMENT 212**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-09-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 612 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER KEVIN COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALVERT M. JANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SOLE ENTERPRISE JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613614F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613613F024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALVERT M. JANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SOLE ENTERPRISE JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES) (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PD FILED BY DEFENDANT JANG & ASSOCIATES (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS CALVERT JANG, AND JANG & ASSOCIATES) (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT JANG, CALVERT M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO SERVED MAY-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT JANG & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1213320F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUARNIZ, ROCIO AS TO DEFENDANT JANG, CALVERT M. JANG & ASSOCIATES DOES 1 THRU 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-20-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-06-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less