This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 03:45:07 (UTC).

ROBERTO A VELASQUEZ VS. MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2013 ROBERTO A VELASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7774

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A

Defendants

ALBA, RICARDO

GRANILLO, RHINA

MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A CORPORATION

DOES 5 THROUGH 25

DOE 1

ALVA, RICARDO

DOE 4

DOE 3

DOE 2

MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

MITCHELL DANIEL L

MITCHELL, DANIEL LEWIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL L. MITCHELL

1151 Harbor Bay Parkway, Suite 121

Alameda, CA 94502

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, EDWARD

Attorney at BRAGG & KULUVAEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery St., Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-18-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-30-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2013 CONTINUED TO SEP-18-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANILLO, RHINA MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC. ALVA, RICARDO

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A AS TO DEFENDANT MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A CORPORATION GRANILLO, RHINA ALBA, RICARDO DOE 1 DOE 2 DOE 4 DOES 5 THROUGH 25

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND)

ORDER

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOLLOWING FAILURE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER DEMURRER SUSTAINED (DENIED)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-30-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR DISMISSED A141804 DIV 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S 'MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL AND PERMIT REINSTATEMENT OF APPEAL' A141804 DIV 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING APPEAL A141804 DIV 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketAPPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, 1 VOL RT (APPEAL FILED 5/7/14, A141804 #5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECTORY NOTICE TO REPORTER - ANTHONY VAUGHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketFEE TO COVER TRIAL COURT COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH ADMINISTERING TRUST ACCOUNTS FOR PAYMENT OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT COSTS IN CIVIL APPEALS (CRC 8.130(B)(1); GC 70632) (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT, TRAN # W2814507A002, TAG # 032603 (8.124) FILED BY APPELLANT VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A (Fee:325.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A (Fee:100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANILLO, RHINA MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC. ALVA, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANILLO, RHINA MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC. ALVA, RICARDO HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2013 CONTINUED TO SEP-18-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketBALANCE OF FEE PAID FOR TRANSACTION W1013107F035 BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYER NOTIFED OF PARTIAL PAYMENT OF FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, ROBERTO A AS TO DEFENDANT MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A CORPORATION GRANILLO, RHINA ALBA, RICARDO DOE 1 DOE 2 DOE 3 DOE 4 DOES 5 THROUGH 25 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:435.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MAR - 3 2014

UNLIMITED JURISDICTION a ROBERTO A. VELASQUEZ, CASE NO. CGC-13-527774 Plaintiff, :

M] JUDGMENT PURSUANT

vs. O ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’

DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL | AMENDED COMPLAINT

SCHOOL, A CORPORATION; RHINA GRANILLO; RICARDO ALBA;; DOE 1; DOE 2; DOE 3; DOE 4; DOES 5 THROUGH 25,

Defendants.

On December 30, 2013, the Court issued an Order granting Defendants Mission Language And Vocational School, Inc., Rhina Gmnillo and Ricardo Alya’s (hereinafter “Defendants”) | Demurrer to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint without leave to amend. On J anuary 2, 2014, Defendants filed their Memorandum of Costs for $1,470, attached hereto as Exhibit A. Plaintiff Roberto A. Velasquez did not file a Motion to Tax or Strike Costs.

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff Roberto Velasquez shall take nothing by way of his Complaint, Amended or otherwise:; Defendants shall recover costs of

suit from said Plaintiff in the amount of $1,470.

My § | 20 M | DATED: o L s | . SEE EXHIT TE\ B on. Judge of the Superior Court COMPLIANGE WITH CRC 8.13 _WARLAJ MILLER

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7774
Case Title:ROBERTO A VELASQUEZ VS. MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A et al
Court Date:DEC-09-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, December 9, 2013, Line 9: DEFENDANTS RHINA GRANILLO'S, MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC.'S, and RICARDO ALVA'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINTContinued to December 30, 2013 to give opposing party the opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B. Opposing party must deliver courtesy copies of the opposition papers to Department 302, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than December 9, 2013 at 4:00 pm or the motion will be granted. Any exhibit must be separated by an exhibit tab per CRC 3.1110(f). The court has courtesy copies of the moving papers. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =302/MJM


Case Number:*******7774
Case Title:ROBERTO A VELASQUEZ VS. MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A et al
Court Date:OCT-07-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, October 7, 2013, Line 9, DEFENDANTS RHINA GRANILLO, MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC., RICARDO ALVA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTThe demurrer is sustained with leave to amend. On September 19, 2013, the Court ordered the opposing party to provide a courtesy copy of the opposition pursuant to San Francisco Local Rule 2.6B with a cover letter reflecting the new hearing date. The opposing party failed to comply with that order. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/PJB)


Case Number:*******7774
Case Title:ROBERTO A VELASQUEZ VS. MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A et al
Court Date:SEP-19-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:On calendar for Thursday, September 19, 2013, Line 13, DEFENDANTS RHINA GRANILLO, MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, INC. AND RICARDO ALVA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTThe motion is continued to October 7, 2013, to give the opposing party a chance to comply with SF Local Rule 2.6B. The opposing party shall provide a courtesy copy of the opposition by September 26, 2013, with a cover letter reflecting the new hearing date. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =302/MJM


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SCHOOL, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garcia, Edward, Jr.