This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 12:00:34 (UTC).

ROBERTA KELLY VS. SUN SHIP LLC.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 ROBERTA KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against SUN SHIP LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6760

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY

Defendants

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUN SHIP, LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorney

BARBER, STEVEN J.

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY AS TO DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/. NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY

Declaration of Roberta Kelly under C.C.P. 377.32

DECLARATION OF ROBERTA KELLY UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 62948683) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY

Proof of Service for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996179), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY SERVED FEB-14-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service for Sun Ship, LLC

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996179), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY SERVED FEB-13-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63063397) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 63063397) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 63109458) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63621018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Feb-20-2020 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON FEB-20-2020 IN DEPT. 503 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FILED ON 7/23/19. GEOFF SLONIKER, ESQ. OF BRAYTON PURCELL LLP APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS, ESQ. APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL SPANOS PRZETAK. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: KELLY ROEMER, CSR#6435 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63621018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 63109458) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • FinancialPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0919313J030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0919313F029

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 63063397) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:$150.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 63063397) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63063397) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996179), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY SERVED FEB-13-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996179), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY SERVED FEB-14-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ROBERTA KELLY UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 62948683) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/. NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819128F040

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, ROBERTA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF PATRICK KELLY AS TO DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less