This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/29/2016 at 12:33:02 (UTC).

ROBERT TACKITT VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS

Case Summary

On 10/03/2002 ROBERT TACKITT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BHC AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3103

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TACKITT, ROBERT

Defendants

DOLAN'S LUMBER WINDOWS & DOORS

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY LTD

THE FLINTKOTE COMPANY

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

GATKE CORPORATION

GENERAL PLUMBING SUPPLY CO.,INC.

PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION

SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES, INC.

DOLAN'S OF CONCORD,INC.

D/C DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

AQUA-CHEM, INC.

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT,INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C AND H

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

GENERAL PLUMBING SUPPLY CO.,INC.

AQUA-CHEM, INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

ASBESTOS CROSS-DEFENDANTS

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C AND H

77 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HENRY, KAREN A

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second Street #1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

JUDY, J. LAWRENCE

Attorney at FREEBURG, JUDY & NETTELS

600 South Lake Ave, Ste 500

Pasadena, CA 91106-3907

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGE & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT SAMUELSEN REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1951 Webster St, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612-2940

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Other Attorneys

SULLIVAN, GEORGE S

Attorney at SEDDWICK,DETERT,MORGAN & ARNOLD

One Embarcadero Center,16Th Fr

Sf, CA 94111-3628

WILSON, LANCE

Attorney at HERZFELD & RUBIN, LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 11Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

DORAN, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GRANT C. WOODRUFF & ASSOCIATES

2200 Professional Dr., Ste.220

Roseville, CA 95661-7744

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore,, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4246

COLOMBATTO, PAUL RICHARD

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD,PLLP

1333 N.California Blvd., Suite, 690

Walnut, CA 94596

DAWSON, THOMAS JOSEPH

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

TAVERA, LEONARD M.

Attorney at TOWLE, DENISON, SMITH & TAVERA, LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulvard, Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

RASMUSSEN, JENNIFER C.

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Ave, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MORR, ALISON L

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE

55 Francisco Street, 6Th

San Francisco, CA 94133

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

ORDER

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TACKITT, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C AND H SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2003 (Fee:206.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVARAS ASBESTOS, LTD. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA,INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL--ELECTRONICALLY FILED FID# 1153179-- FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT,INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketJURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1507A18J010 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketJURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0907A25J008 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • DocketREFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 30711 FOR TRANSACTION B8806915J015 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC#1901852991, WARRANT #38002901, DATED MAR-27-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR ON MAR-30-2009 IN DEPT. 606. MS. HALBANY, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS INFORMED THE COURT THE CASE SETTLED ENTIRELY. JUDGE TOMAR MASON, CLERK MARIA OLOPERNES-PENA, NOT REPORTED, D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-17-2009 CONTINUED TO MAR-30-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN 606. THIS CASE IS TRAILING THE CURRENT BP 417 SUBGROUP BEING TRIED IN DEPT. 606. AT ANY TIME, THIS CASE MAY BE ADVANCED FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS, D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL (BP417) SET FOR FEB-09-2009 CONTINUED TO FEB-17-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN 606 FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. JUDGE TOMAR MASON, CLERK MARIA OLOPERNES-PENA, MATTER NOT REPORTED, D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL (BP417) HELD ON FEB-05-2009 CONTINUED TO FEB-09-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN 606 FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. ALL PARTIES SHOULD BE PREPARED FOR VOIR DIRE EXAMINATION, WITNESS LIST AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE. MINUTES UNDER THE LEAD CASE BEDDOES VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS, #406841. JUDGE TOMAR MASON, CLERK MARIA OLOPERNES-PENA, REPORTER WENDY PUN #12891, D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-04-2009 CONTINUED TO FEB-05-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN 606 FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS PER ORDER OF COURT. MATTER NOT REPORTED, D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
497 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2003
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL--ELECTRONICALLY FILED FID# 1153179-- FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA,INC. (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVARAS ASBESTOS, LTD. (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TACKITT, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C AND H SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2003 (Fee:206.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL PLUMBING SUPPLY COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DOLAN'S OF CONCORDINC is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLAS HEATING & VENTILATING CO., LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where D/C DISTRIBUTION LLC, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO D/C DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION is a litigant