This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 14:52:50 (UTC).

ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE VS. ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2013 ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7334

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST

Defendants

THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH

THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA

San Francisco, CA 94114

DOES 1 TO 10,INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORNSTEIN, DANIEL M

Attorney at BORNSTEIN & BORNSTEIN

507 Polk Street, Ste 410

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

AGOGLIA, MICHAEL J

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

425 Market St.

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA DOES 1 TO 10,INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

EX PARTE APPLIC FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST (Fee:20.00)

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10,INCLUSIVE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA HEARING SET FOR FEB-20-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:450.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA HEARING SET FOR FEB-20-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10,INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST SERVED JAN-08-2014, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT SEALE, TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT M SEALE REVOCABLE TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS-EL BEZE, ELIJAH THOMAS-EL BEZE, EVA DOES 1 TO 10,INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGOGLIA, MICHAEL J