This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 01:25:26 (UTC).

ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL VS. ZYNGA INC. et al (Deft's 170.6 Challenge Judge Wiss)

Case Summary

On 08/01/2012 ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against ZYNGA INC Deft's 170 6 Challenge Judge Wiss. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2876

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

ALLEN & COMAPNY LLC

BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.

GOLDMAN SACHS & CO

GORDON, WILLIAM

HOFFMAN, REID

J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC

KATZENBERG, JEFFREY

MERESMEN, STANLEY J

MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC

PAUL, SUNIL

PINCUS, MARK

SCHAPPERT, JOHN

VAN NATTA, OWEN

VRANESH, MARK

WEHNER, DAVID M

ZYNGA INC.

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOTTINI JR, FRANCIS A

Attorney at CHAPIN FITZGERALD SULLIVAN & BOTTINI LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

COCHRAN, BRIAN E.

Attorney at ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP

655 West Boradway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

SEEFER, CHRISTOPHER P.

Attorney at ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

STRAUSS, SIMONA G.

Attorney at SIMPSON THACKER & BARTLETT LLP

2550 Hanover St.

Palto Alto, CA 94304

ANGIOLILLO, BRUCE D.

YOUNGWOOD, JONATHAN K.

ROETHER, JEFFREY L.

ETH, JORDAN DAVID

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT VRANESH, MARK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT VAN NATTA, OWEN

VERIFIED UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS & CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AND ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

VERIFIED UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AND ALLEN COMPANY LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 52527332) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

DECLARATION OF SIMONA G. STRAUSS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS & CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AN

DECLARATION OF SIMONA G. STRAUSS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AND ALLEN COMPANY LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 52527332) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

DECLARATION OF SIMONA G. STRAUSS IN SUPPORT UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JEFFREY L. ROETHER AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS & CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AND ALLEN & COMPA

DECLARATION OF SIMONA G. STRAUSS IN SUPPORT UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO ADMIT JEFFREY L. ROETHER AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS CO., MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATED, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., AND ALLEN COMPANY LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 52527340) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 55207151): ROETHER, JEFFREY L. REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

Joint Case Management Statement

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 55455899) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM HOFFMAN, REID KATZENBERG, JEFFREY MERESMEN, STANLEY J PAUL, SUNIL SCHAPPERT, JOHN VAN NATTA, OWEN

Zynga Defendants Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Further Support Of Their Motion To Continue Stay Of Proceedings In Favor of the Federal Securities Class Action

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IN FAVOR OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 55864986) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC.

Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 56558550) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED SEP-05-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-02-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service Re Youngwood Pro Hac Vice Application

PROOF OF SERVICE RE YOUNGWOOD PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52536687) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

Proof of Service Re Roether Pro Hac Vice Application

PROOF OF SERVICE RE ROETHER PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52536827) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC

Zynga Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Stay Proceedings in Favor of the Federal Securities Class Action

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO MTN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IN FAVOR OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 52698095) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM HOFFMAN, REID KATZENBERG, JEFFREY MERESMEN, STANLEY J PAUL, SUNIL SCHAPPERT, JOHN VAN NATTA, OWEN

Zynga Defendants Proof of Service for Demurrer

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 52702753) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM HOFFMAN, REID KATZENBERG, JEFFREY MERESMEN, STANLEY J PAUL, SUNIL SCHAPPERT, JOHN VAN NATTA, OWEN

Exhibits 2 and 3 to Declaration of Kevin A. Calia in Support of Zynga Defendants Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings in Favor of the Federal Securities Class Action

EXHIBITS 2 AND 3 TO DECLARATION OF KEVIN A. CALIA IN SUPPORT OF ZYNGA DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IN FAVOR OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 55586483) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM

Proof of Service to Notice of Petition for Writ of Mandate, Prohibition, or Other Relief Filed in the Court of Appeal of the State of California

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL / VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE & SERVE TO NTC OF PETN FOR WRIT OF MANDATE, PROHIBITION, OR OTHER RELIEF FILED IN THE COURT OF APPEAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 56246426) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC.

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-24-2015

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-24-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • APR-08-2015 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY BRUCE D. ANGIOLILLO - OFF CALENDAR, NO PARTIES FOUND FOR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-13-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR PER DISMISSAL FILED FEB-11-2015. (304)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(A) WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF ANY OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUTATIVE CLASS (TRANSACTION #56761508)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56746854) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56746638) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM HOFFMAN, REID KATZENBERG, JEFFREY MERESMEN, STANLEY J PAUL, SUNIL SCHAPPERT, JOHN VAN NATTA, OWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56715211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF FRANCIS A. BOTTINI, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 56715211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(A) WITH PREJUDICE OAS TO PLTF'S CLAIMS AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE CLAIMS OF ANY OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUTATIVE CLASS (TRANSACTION ID # 56715211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT MERESMEN, STANLEY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT KATZENBERG, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT HOFFMAN, REID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT GORDON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT VRANESH, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT WEHNER, DAVID M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT PINCUS, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED AUG-10-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE AUG-30-2012 ON DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT REYES, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT ZYNGA INC. PINCUS, MARK WEHNER, DAVID M VRANESH, MARK GORDON, WILLIAM HOFFMAN, REID KATZENBERG, JEFFREY MERESMEN, STANLEY J PAUL, SUNIL SCHAPPERT, JOHN VAN NATTA, OWEN GOLDMAN SACHS & CO MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC ALLEN & COMPANY LLC DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-02-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-01-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

K ~1 A

- SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT 305

ROBERT REYES, individually and on behalf ) Case No. CGC-12-522876 of all others similarly situated, ) |

) ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Plaintiff, VS.

) ) ) ZYNGA INC., MARC PINCUS, DAVID M. ) WEHNER, MARK VRANESH, WILLIAM ) GORDON, REID HOFFMAN, JEFFREY ) KATZENBERG, STANLEY J. ) MERESMAN, SUNIL PAUL, JOHN ) SCHAPPERT, OWEN VAN NATTA, ) GOLDMAN SACHS & CO., MERRILL ) LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INC.,) BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., MORGAN ) STANLEY & CO. LLC, J.P. MORGAN ) SECURITIES LLC, ALLEN & COMPANY ) LLC, and DOES 1-25, inclusive, )

Defendants.

Defendants Zynga Inc., Mafk Pincus, David M. Wehner, Mark Vranesh, William Gordon, Jeffrey Katzenberg, Stanley J. Meresman, Sunil Paul, John Schappert, and Owen Van Natta (collectively, the “Zynga Defendants™) demurred to each and every cause of action in plaintiff Robert Reyes’ Amended Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws (the “Amended Complaint™) on the ground that plaintiff’s entire Amended Complaint fails to state