This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/06/2020 at 02:31:37 (UTC).

ROBERT RAGO VS. COLLEEN COEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 ROBERT RAGO filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against COLLEEN COEN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5700

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAGO, ROBERT

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

COEN, COLLEEN

GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

MODENA & ROYCE A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHWARTZ, DONALD CHARLES

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DONALD C. SCHWARTZ

7960-B Soquel Drive No.291

Aptos, CA 95003

REGLI, TRACY S

Attorney at ACUNA REGLI

3478 Buskirk Avenue, Ste 300

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Defendant Attorney

HENNING, JOHN F

Attorney at HENNING & WALLACEJOHN F. HENNING III, ESQ.

530 Jackson Street

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-24-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61841940)

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61800198): REGLI, TRACY S SUBSTITUTED FOR SCHWARTZ, DONALD CHARLES AS ATTORNEY FOR RAGO, ROBERT

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-24-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT(S) RE: STATUS OF STAY. THE MAR-07-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-08-2017 CONTINUED TO MAR-07-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-10-2017 CONTINUED TO NOV-08-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS COLLEEN COEN AND OLIVER GUTIERREZ'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JOHN F. HENNING III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO P

DECLARATION OF JOHN F. HENNING III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17030061) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17030061) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

Proof of Service in Opposition to Demurrer

PROOF OF SERVICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17025065) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAGO, ROBERT

Declaration of Donald Charles Schwartz, Esq. in Opposition to Demurrer

DECLARATION OF DONALD CHARLES SCHWARTZ, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17025065) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAGO, ROBERT

Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Demurrer

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17025065) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAGO, ROBERT

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 17025062) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAGO, ROBERT

DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT COLLEEN COEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL

DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT COLLEEN COEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024031) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT OLIVER GUTIERREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPE

DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT OLIVER GUTIERREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024031) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

DEFENDANTS COLLEEN COENS AND OLIVER GUTIERREZS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024031) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

DECLARATION OF JOHN F. HENNING III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL AN

DECLARATION OF JOHN F. HENNING III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024027) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

DEFENDANTS COLLEEN COENS AND OLIVER GUTIERREZS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NO

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024027) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Apr-03-2018 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-24-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61841940)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61800198): REGLI, TRACY S SUBSTITUTED FOR SCHWARTZ, DONALD CHARLES AS ATTORNEY FOR RAGO, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Feb-22-2018 Set For Order To Show Cause On Apr-24-18 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-24-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT(S) RE: STATUS OF STAY. THE MAR-07-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Oct-25-2017 Continued To Mar-07-18 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-08-2017 CONTINUED TO MAR-07-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-21-2017 Continued To Nov-08-17 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-10-2017 CONTINUED TO NOV-08-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOHN F. HENNING III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100009026) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100009026) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • FinancialPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2117110R007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2117110F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 17008030) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17008030) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT RAGOS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17008030) FILED BY DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0916C06F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAGO, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT COEN, COLLEEN MODENA & ROYCE A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN GUTIERREZ, OLIVER DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-10-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-06-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-17-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5700
Case Title:ROBERT RAGO VS. COLLEEN COEN ET AL
Court Date:FEB-07-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, February 7, 2017, LINE 9DEFENDANTS COLLEEN COEN and OLIVER GUTIERREZ'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTOn its own motion the court treats the demurrer of defendants Colleen Coen and Oliver Gutierrez to all four causes of action in the complaint filed by plaintiff Robert Rago as a motion to stay this case pending the completion of the family law case currently pending in San Mateo County and grants the motion to stay. This case is stayed until the conclusion of Rago v. Rago, San Mateo Superior Court No. F0119845. All issues raised in this case can and should be raised in the San Mateo case. The alleged misconduct supporting all four causes of action allegedly occurred in the San Mateo case and the alleged damages result from rulings in that case. Unless this case is stayed, there is a significant risk of inconsistent rulings. Finally, judicial economy strongly supports not having two cases pending relating to the same issues at the same time in adjacent counties. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for Ms. Coen and Mr. Gutierrez is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/HK


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henning, John F., III