This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 08:56:50 (UTC).

ROBERT OZERETNY VS. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2016 ROBERT OZERETNY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6507

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OZERETNY, ROBERT

Defendants

COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

PAREX USA, INC. (FKA PAREXLAHABRA, INC., FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS, INC.)

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION)

DOES 1-800, INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

JUDIN, JENNIFER

Attorney at DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 4300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

505 Howard Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BARBER, STEVEN J.

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ACTING AS JUDGE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ACTING AS JUDGE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

ANSWER OF FAMILIAN CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

Answer of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC, fka Georgia-Pacific Corporati

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59006459) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) (Fee:1450.00)

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.s ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONA

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58998464) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

Defendant MetLifes Notice of Posting Jury Fees

JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:150.00)

Defendant MetLifes Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant MetLifes Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:1450.00)

Proof of Service for Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. to be filed

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58962575), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

Proof of Service for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-13-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service for Defendant Parex USA, Inc. ( fka Parexlahabra, Inc

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-14-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PAREX USA, INC. (FKA PAREXLAHABRA, INC., FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS, INC.)

Proof of Service for Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC (fka Georgia-Pacifi

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-13-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION)

Proof of Service for Defendant Familian Corporation to be filed

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-08-2016, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-08-2016 ON DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

Proof of Service for Defendant Consolidated Insulation, Inc. to be fil

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PRELIMINARY FACT/SHEET NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOES 1-800, INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FAMILIAN CORPORATION GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PAREX USA, INC. (FKA PAREXLAHABRA, INC., FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS, INC.) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-16-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ACTING AS JUDGE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59021315) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59006459) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58998464) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58984852) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58962575), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-13-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-14-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PAREX USA, INC. (FKA PAREXLAHABRA, INC., FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS, INC.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-13-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-08-2016, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-08-2016 ON DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58898025), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT SERVED APR-12-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PRELIMINARY FACT/SHEET NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OZERETNY, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. DOES 1-800, INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FAMILIAN CORPORATION GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PAREX USA, INC. (FKA PAREXLAHABRA, INC., FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS, INC.) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-16-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6507
Case Title:ROBERT OZERETNY VS. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. ET AL
Court Date:OCT-12-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thusday, October 12, 2017 in Department 503, Line 1. Defendant Consolidated Insulation, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is off calendar at the moving party's request. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6507
Case Title:ROBERT OZERETNY VS. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. ET AL
Court Date:FEB-19-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Continued Motion To Consolidate For Trial The Cases Against Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. And Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. Formerly Known As Kaiser Cement Corporation
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 in Department 503, Line 24. Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate for trial the cases against Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. and Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. formerly known as Kaiser Cement corporation, into the following subgroups: 1) wrongful death/mesothelioma; 2) living/lung cancer: 3) wrongful death/lung cancer; 4) living/other cancer; 5) wrongful death/other cancer; 6) living/asbestosis; 7) wrongful death/asbestosis; 8) living/pleural disease, is denied. The actions do not involve sufficient common questions of law or fact, economy and convenience would not be served by a joint trial, and consolidation may prejudice one or both of the defendants. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL SUGAR & REFINING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PAREX USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAMILIAN CORPORATION is a litigant