This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:42:11 (UTC).

ROBERT FRANCIS et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2007 ROBERT FRANCIS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4155

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCIS, PATSY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ROBERT FRANCIS, DECEASED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

PINI HARDWARE, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

SEE ATTACHED LIST

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

FRANCIS, STEVEN

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

C.C.M. CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

DOES 1-8500

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

HARRIS CORPORATION, WHICH WILL TRANSACT BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS HARRIS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CO

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

WILLIAMS, NANCY T

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BROWN, EUGENE

Attorney at FILICE, BROWN, EASSA & MCLEOD, LLP

1999 Harrison St. 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A.

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

Other Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison Street, Ste.2600

Oakland, CA 94612-3541

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Answer of Allis-Chalmers Corp. Product Liability Trust to Complaint fo

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14816760) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16583316) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22889872) FILED BY DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23443369) AS TO DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

DEFENANT DANA COMPANIES LLCS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 23621801) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

Exhibits F and G to Declaration of Christina M. Helwig in Support of Eaton Electrical Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

EXHIBITS F AND G TO DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA M. HELWIG IN SUPPORT OF EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 26434035) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 26470919) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal as to Western Auto Supply Company, without prejudice, with a mutual waiver of costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26683614) AS TO DEFENDANT WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 508 FOR TRIAL (TRANS# 28239903)

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCIS, ROBERT FRANCIS, PAT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14950366) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION , A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19934176) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 19948582) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Defendant Pini Hardwares Answer to First Amended Complaint, Wrongful Death-Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20072308) FILED BY DEFENDANT PINI HARDWARE (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DANA COMPANIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23833179) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant Ford Motor Company; Proof of Service

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 25908680): LANKFORD, PAUL V SUBSTITUTED FOR BROWN, EUGENE AS ATTORNEY FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Declaration of Alan Watson in Support of Defendant Harris Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Of Issues

DECLARATION OF ALAN WATSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HARRIS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 26500150) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARRIS CORPORATION

Declaration of Alan Watson in Support of Defendant Harris Corporations Ex Parte Application for Order Re Filing of Harris Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, for Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF ALAN WATSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HARRIS CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE FILING OF HARRIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 26920729) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARRIS CORPORATION

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2011
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 24630 FOR TRANSACTION W3609B02J012 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903684097, WARRANT #38200779, DATED MAY-23-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36269534)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 - DUPLICATE ENTRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32543149) AS TO DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (THE COURT APPOINTS PATSY FRANCIS AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DEBRA FRANCIS.) FILED PER ORDER BY PLAINTIFF FRANCIS, PATSY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ROBERT FRANCIS, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14816760) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14759492) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14730470) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 14645123) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14645123) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14573018) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14573018) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCIS, ROBERT FRANCIS, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCIS, ROBERT FRANCIS, PAT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCM Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS AS TRUSTEE DEBRA is a litigant

Latest cases where ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I is a litigant

Latest cases where CUTLER-HAMMER is a litigant