This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 13:15:36 (UTC).

ROBERT ENGLE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2009 ROBERT ENGLE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GARRETT L. WONG, TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5296

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

GARRETT L. WONG

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Defendants

UNION OIL OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 TO 8500

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

YARWAY CORPORATION

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

L&M AUTO SUPPLY

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

DUFFY, JOSEPH

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

SHELDON, CHARLES T

POND, FRANK D

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Other Attorneys

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

YOUNG, DENNIS MICHAEL

STORM, LUCINDA L

DONADIO, DAVID R

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

Def. Yarway Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos & POS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27785850) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

(MIL # 3) HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES OR THOSE NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION

(MIL # 3) MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES OR THOSE NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 37404939) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32210916) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:370.00)

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation only. Each party to bear its own

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43066125) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to Shell Oil Company only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39701549) AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28065324) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT - MULTIPLE PARTIES

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32671353) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC. ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD. BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION GATKE CORPORATION H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY L. J. MILEY COMPANY LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. MAREMONT CORPORATION MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PNEUMO ABEX LLC RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC. SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. STANDCO, INC. STUART-WESTERN, INC. THE BUDD COMPANY U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC. UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. FORD MOTOR COMPANY DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION L&M AUTO SUPPLY ARROYO GRANDE AUTO PARTS

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. HURWITZ IN SUPPORT OF (MIL #13) MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS OF CHARLES AY

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. HURWITZ IN SUPPORT OF (MIL #13) MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS OF CHARLES AY (TRANSACTION ID # 37404939) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 31343489): YOUNG, DENNIS MICHAEL SUBSTITUTED FOR JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE AS ATTORNEY FOR FLOWSERVE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Aug-26-2016 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-01-2016. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 8/3/16. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-07-2016 Continued To Sep-01-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59369595)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-01-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Feb-04-2016 Continued To Aug-04-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Oct-01-2015 Continued To Feb-04-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27696251) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27696251) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF. FLOWSERVE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER-ASBESTOS. (TRANSACTION ID # 27689949) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27689949) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27689949) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W5509A16F006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27551368) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $365; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1209803F009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENGLE, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1 TO 8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010; Fee: $365.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less