This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:03 (UTC).

ROBERT COFFEE VS. JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ROBERT COFFEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8437

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COFFEE, ROBERT

Defendants

JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY

PICK, JEREMIAH

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEITH BRENDA CRUZ

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

Attorney at BRENDA CRUZ KEITH LAWYER

1965 Market Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PICK, JEREMIAH

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY PICK, JEREMIAH DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-17-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE AUG-07-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-07-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE SEP-17-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2014
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-09-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE SEP-17-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-17-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE AUG-07-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-07-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PICK, JEREMIAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COFFEE, ROBERT AS TO DEFENDANT JEREMIAH'S PICK COFFEE COMPANY PICK, JEREMIAH DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less