Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:42:14 (UTC).

RICHARD YEE VS. DOE I et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 RICHARD YEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOE I. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4194

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEE, RICHARD

Defendants

DOE I

San Francisco, CA 94109

WATSON, RICHARD

San Francisco, CA 94109

DOES II TO X

San Francisco, CA 94109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACRAMENTO, JOSEPH ALCORDO

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH A. SACRAMENTO

1489 Webster Street, Suite 248

San Francisco, CA 94115

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT DOES II TO X WATSON, RICHARD

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT DOE I DOES II TO X SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED MAY-29-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED FEB-06-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES II TO X

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED MAY-29-2014, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES II TO X

COURT JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1134 HYDE STREET, #12, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94109 $5,455.49 RENT, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,455.49, SEE SCANNED DOC

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

JUDEM

DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED FEB-06-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOE I

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $15.06 FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD (Fee:IFP)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $15.06 FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1134 HYDE STREET, #12, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94109 $5,455.49 RENT, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,455.49, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED MAY-29-2014, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES II TO X

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WATSON, RICHARD (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED FEB-06-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES II TO X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT DOES II TO X WATSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD SERVED FEB-06-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOE I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT DOE I DOES II TO X SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less