This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 06:27:17 (UTC).

RICHARD LUJAN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2007 RICHARD LUJAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, HAROLD E. KAHN, GARRETT L. WONG, PANG LY, DAVID BALLATI and PATRICK J. MAHONEY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4270

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

HAROLD E. KAHN

GARRETT L. WONG

PANG LY

DAVID BALLATI

PATRICK J. MAHONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUJAN, RICHARD

Defendants

BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARIES SUED INCORRECTLY HEREIN AS BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

TOMPKINS, RENETTE

Martinez, CA 94553

UNOCAL CORP.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

MAREMONT CORPORATION

FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORP.

GATKE CORPORATION

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION(NAPA)

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS, INC.

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 941051126

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCMAHAN, TROY DEAN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

1999 Harrison Street, 18Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612

WORDEN, JOHN SPENCER

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St. Twr

San Francisco, CA 94105

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Ste 700

Gardena, CA 902477468

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive

Oakland, CA 94612

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 946082604

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 31392760) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16440334) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Demand for Jury Trial

DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16092513) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

EXHIBITS K, L, M AND N TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT V. BETETTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES, BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

EXHIBITS K, L, M AND N TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT V. BETETTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 31656095) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 30695288) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC.

Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16029703) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16252648) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, RICHARD HEARING SET FOR OCT-11-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 30695288) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC. HEARING SET FOR JUL-20-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220 (Fee:200.00)

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16805623) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Mar-25-2016 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-07-2016. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 2/29/16. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-03-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-07-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. GEOFF SLONIKER, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Mar-03-2016 Continued To Apr-07-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58639584)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2015 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON MAR-03-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, CASE RESOLVED PER PLAINTIFF. ANDREW CHEW APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. NO APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT RPI (PLANT INSULATION CO.). JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-18-2015 Set For Order To Show Cause On Mar-03-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Dec-11-2014 Continued To Jun-18-15 At 01:45 P.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: TARA WILLIAMS, CSR#13428 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON AUG-28-2014 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: E. BURA; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR# 5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
369 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15900916) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC, ERRONEOUSLY AND IMPROPERLY NAMED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS AN "ALTERNATE ENTITY" OF "AMERICAN LAFRANCE CORPORATION", " GRAY MOTOR COMPANY" AND "GRAY MARINE"; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R0207809F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15881225) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $335; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B1207808F012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMTE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15874642) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15874642) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC.; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $335; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W3207702F012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUJAN, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008; Fee: $335.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNOCAL CORPORATION is a litigant