This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:22:57 (UTC).

RICHARD G CLARK et al VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2007 RICHARD G CLARK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4375

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLARK, RICHARD G

CLARK, BARBARA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

CRANE CO

CHRYSLER, LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC

YARWAY CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

DOES 1-800

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

RILEY POWER, INC., (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "RILEY POWER, INC. FKA DB RILEY, INC.")

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC FKA GARLOCK, INC.

CRANE CO.

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

LOPEZ, RONALD FRANK

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY

One Embarcadero Ctr., 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

HARTWELL, MORTIMER H

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

KEENEY, ROBERT CHARLES

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY LLP

100 Bush St Ste 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

LYMAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3941

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLARK, RICHARD G CLARK, BARBARA AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. CRANE CO DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Def. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Def. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.s Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Time.

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Def. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.s Objection to Stipulation of Hearing by Commissioner.

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Defendant J.S. Guerin and Cos Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos [Asbestos-related case]

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16383918) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant J.S. Guerin and Cos Objection to Stipulation of Hearing by Court Commissioner [Asbestos-related case]

DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN AND COS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER [ASBESTOS-RELATED CASE] (TRANSACTION ID # 16383918) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16417881) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Yarway Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury, Loss of Consortium - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16433466) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Substitution of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 23815772): LOPEZ RONALD F SUBSTITUTED FOR WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL AS ATTORNEY FOR GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23815772) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED IN U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT OF SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (TRANSACTION ID # 25569520) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

Substitution of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 25944643): HUGO, EDWARD R SUBSTITUTED FOR PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J. AS ATTORNEY FOR LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26814168) AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29844882)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 30952005) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (re entire action of all parties and all causes of action)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31392555) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT PER ORDER (PER 7/14/10 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.'S MOTION TO CORRECT PARTY NAME FILED IN CGC-84-828684) DEFENDANT SUED INCORRECTLY AS BUFFALO PUMPS INC TO BE AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT PER ORDER (PER 7/14/10 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.'S MOTION TO CORRECT PARTY NAME FILED IN CGC-84-828684) DEFENDANT SUED INCORRECTLY AS BUFFALO PUMPS INC TO BE AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31392555) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 30952005) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29844882)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26814168) AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 25944643): HUGO, EDWARD R SUBSTITUTED FOR PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J. AS ATTORNEY FOR LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED IN U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT OF SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (TRANSACTION ID # 25569520) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23815772) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 23815772): LOPEZ RONALD F SUBSTITUTED FOR WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL AS ATTORNEY FOR GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 21935480): HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY SUBSTITUTED FOR HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY AS ATTORNEY FOR A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16433466) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16417881) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN AND COS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER [ASBESTOS-RELATED CASE] (TRANSACTION ID # 16383918) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16383918) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16370445) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLARK, RICHARD G CLARK, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLARK, RICHARD G CLARK, BARBARA AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. CRANE CO DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less