This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 22:58:59 (UTC).

RICHARD BERTACCHI VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2006 RICHARD BERTACCHI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4670

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

THE WM. POWEL COMPANY

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTIRC CORPORATION

R.F. MACDONALD CO.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

FOELY-PMI, INC.

DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY

TGERRY STEAM TURBINE CO.

CRANE CO

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS CO. (WESTGLAS)

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

GRACO INC.

MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, INC.

D/C DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC., FKA KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION AND KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1333 North California Blvd., Suite 690

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BUTY, MADELINE L

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 N Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WORDEN, JOHN SPENCER

Attorney at MORGENSTEIN & JUBELIRER LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

CATALDO, LORI A.

MCELHERN, SCOTT D.

Attorney at DOWNEY BRAND LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Fl

Sacramento, CA 95814

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Def. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANYS Answer to Unverified Complaint for Perso

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12484938) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

GOULDS PUMPS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY) - ASBES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12667179) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12732730) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Collins Electrical Company, Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Pe

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12738287) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 13949157) AS TO DEFENDANT CAMPBELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Request for Dismissal of Complaint without prejudice as to defendant A.W. Chesterton Company only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17604352) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

Defendant Scott Co. of Californias Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18474810) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR APR-24-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT , WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 18554489) AS TO DEFENDANT GL&V/DORR-OLIVER INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18732908) AS TO DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.

Defendant Monterey Mechanical Companys Joinder to Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd.s Amended Motion to Sever or in the Alternative to Vacate-Continue Trial Date

JOINDER TO CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD'S AMENDED MOTION TO SEVER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO VACATE/CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18982885) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY HEARING SET FOR APR-03-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. STRICKLAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF???S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. STRICKLAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 19372014) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERTACCHI, RICHARD

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19490048) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIKING AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER COMPANY DBA VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST???S ASBESTOS CASE STATUS REPORT

ASBESTOS CASE STATUS REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 19582958) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET 3, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET 3, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 23049827) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.

Viking Automatic Sprinkler Companys Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (UNDISPUTED MATERIAL) IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 23354256) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIKING AUTOMATIC SPRINKLER COMPANY DBA VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT BALDWIN CONTRACTING COMPANY NOTICE OF MOTION ANDMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF MOTION ANDMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 23453261) FILED BY DEFENDANT BALDWIN CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 24404173) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERTACCHI, RICHARD

Request for Dismissal W/ PREJ AS TO COMPLT AS TO DEFT GRINNELL CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27744746) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

307 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. GIL PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM IN DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO JAN-25-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERTACCHI, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54252673) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53759844) AS TO DEFENDANT ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
361 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANYS DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 12484938) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12484938) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 12472871) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12472871) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12469307) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12451085) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12420597) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERTACCHI, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERTACCHI, RICHARD AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H,I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-16-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIKING NORTHWEST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WM. POWEL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GRACO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO is a litigant