This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 03:03:58 (UTC).

RENE J. ZUNIGA et al VS. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2011 RENE J ZUNIGA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7450

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZUNIGA, RENE J.

PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

THE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE CAPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

Intervenor

GONZALEZ RIVERA, EDGARDO R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

PACHECO, NICK

LLOYD, DEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DEAN LLOYD

445 Sherman Avenue, Suite 1

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Defendant Attorneys

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

JARA, CYNTHIA M.

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP

Three Embarcadero Ctr, 12Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HASENKAMPF, ANTON L

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP

Three Embarcadero Center,, 12Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: OF DISMISSAL (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFTNS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-30-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF THE INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-AR35 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR35 UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2006, IT'S ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE THE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY INTERVENOR GONZALEZ RIVERA, EDGARDO R HEARING SET FOR DEC-09-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL SERVED PLNTF'S OPPOSITION TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.'S DEMURRER AMENDED COMPLAINT AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL

REPLY

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS OF DEFTS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLT FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED SUSTAINING DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF THE INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-AR35 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR35 UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2006, IT'S ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

REPLY

REPLY TO OPPOS TO MOTION EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF THE INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-AR35 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR35 UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2006, IT'S ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-30-2011 CONTINUED TO FEB-17-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-09-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT DEUTCHE BANK'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, SUBMITTED ON FEB-06-2012 BY RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. BOTH COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS. (501/REQ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-06-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-09-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE, OBTAIN ANSWER(S), ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE, AND RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE CAPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE FEB-17-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, DEUTSCHE BANKS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS IS OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY. (501/REQ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS CONTINUED FROM JAN-19-2012 TO LAW AND MOTION AT FEB-06-2012, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 501 PER 1-19-12 DEPT. 302 RULING. (501/REQ)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR MAY-26-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: SUSTAIN WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. NO OPPOSITION FILED. PREVAILING PARTY TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER. (302/LMG) JUDGE: LORETTA M. GIORGI, REPORTER: KARLA ELLIS-DAVIS, CSR #12998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LLOYD DEAN SUBSTITUTED FOR PACHECO, NICK AS ATTORNEY FOR ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY HEARING SET FOR MAY-26-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JUN-13-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-30-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAR-30-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF THE INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-AR35 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR35 UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2006, IT'S ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZUNIGA, RENE J. PAREDES, YERIS A. AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF THE INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-AR35 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR35 UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2006, IT'S ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-24-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-21-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-09-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less