This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 13:49:25 (UTC).

REGAL STONE LIMITED et al VS. LONGS DRUGS STORE CALIFRONIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2012 REGAL STONE LIMITED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LONGS DRUGS STORE CALIFRONIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0197

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REGAL STONE LIMITED

FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD

Defendants

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC

LONGS DRUGS STORE CALIFRONIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS AN INDIVIDUAL

LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC

LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL

MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M

CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL

LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEESAL, JR, SAMUEL A.

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN

400 Oceangate,, P.O. Box 1730

Long Beach, CA 90801-1730

Defendant Attorneys

MCCORD, CLINTON J

Attorney at EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP

9665 Wilshire Blvd Ste 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

LAPOINTE, JON-PAUL

Attorney at EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-22-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

COMPLEX LIT FEES PD FILED BY DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M (Fee:3850.00)

MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT NTC OF MTN TO STRIKE; MEMO OF P & A AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M HEARING SET FOR JUL-10-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL

MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT NTC OF MTN TO STRIKE; MEMO OF P & A AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

Order Granting Complex Designation and for Single Assignment

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-31-2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305. SEP-19-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPARTMENT 610 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MTN TO STAY PLTFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 20 LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC

MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2012 10:30 AM

MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2012 10:30 AM

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 48513959)

ORDER

ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56451277)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15217027)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15217027)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56451277)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - AUTHORIZATION TO RE-ASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 56451261)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 48513959)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (TRANS# 47467428)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION HEARING RE MTN TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL AND MOTION TO STAY PLTFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT HELD ON OCT-30-2012, IN DEPT. 305. COUNSEL SUBMITS ORAL ARGUMENTS. THE COURT GRANTS THE MTN TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, AND MOTION TO STAY PLTFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER MARY ANN SCANLAN, CSR 8875; DEPT. 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION HEARING RE MOTION TO STAY PLTFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT HELD ON OCT-30-2012, IN DEPT. 305. COUNSEL SUBMITS ORAL ARGUMENTS. THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION TO STAY PLTFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. COUNSEL SHALL PREPARE THE WRITTEN ORDER. JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER MARY ANN SCANLAN, CSR 8875; DEPT. 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION HEARING RE MTN TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL HELD ON OCT-30-2012, IN DEPT. 305. COUNSEL SUBMITS ORAL ARGUMENTS. THE COURT GRANTS THE MTN TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, AND SIGNS THE WRITTEN ORDER. JUDGE JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER MARY ANN SCANLAN, CSR 8875; DEPT. 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2012 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET COMPLEX LITIGATION FILED BY DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS M (Fee:2870.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-22-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-25-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD SERVED APR-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUGS STORE CALIFRONIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION KACMAREK, DEBORAH AN INDIVIDUAL MEHRJEDI, FERDOUS AN INDIVIDUAL BAYTAMOUNY, ANAS AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-19-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-19-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-04-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS/CAREMARK RHODE ISLAND CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEESAL SAMUEL AARON JR