This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 04:48:55 (UTC).

REGAL STONE LIMITED et al VS. LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2011 REGAL STONE LIMITED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L L C. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7784

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD.

REGAL STONE LIMITED

Defendants

DOES 1-10

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1-20

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C.

CHESTER, LOUIE

CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC., A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH II, JOSEPH A.

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

400 Oceangate, P.O. Box 1730

Long Beach, CA 90801-1730

Defendant Attorney

LAPOINTE, JON-PAUL

Attorney at EDWARDS, ANGELL, PALMER & DODGE, LLC

660 Newport Ctr Dr. , Ste 650

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-18-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-02-2011 CONTINUED TO NOV-18-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO OCTOBER 13, 2011; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-01-2011 CONTINUED TO SEP-02-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JULY 29, 2011; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC., A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION CHESTER, LOUIE DOES 1-20 LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (REDACTED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-01-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-01-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-16-2011 (Fee:410.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-18-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS REGAL STONE LIMITED AND FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CVS ON 9/14/11. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS REGAL STONE LIMITED AND FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CVS ON 9/14/11. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS REGAL STONE LIMITED AND FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CVS ON 9/14, 2011. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-06-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-06-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-06-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DECLARATION OF BEN SUTER IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS REGAL STONE LIMITED, FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (CRC 2.550) IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 11, 2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302 PER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. JUDGE: LORETTA M. GIORGI; REPORTER: KARLA ELLIS-DAVIS, CSR #12998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JULY 29, 2011; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • FEE PAID ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FO EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. HEARING SET FOR APR-28-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES, LLC., A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY LONGS DRUG STORES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION CHESTER, LOUIE DOES 1-20 LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • DECLARATION OF JOSEPH A. WALSH II IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (CRC 2.550), PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. HEARING SET FOR APR-28-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (REDACTED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD. AS TO DEFENDANT LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-01-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-01-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-16-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7784
Case Title:REGAL STONE LIMITED et al VS. LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. et al
Court Date:OCT-06-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, October 6, 2011, line 10. Plaintiffsu00BF motion for leave to file second amended complaint is off calendar. Notice of removal filed by defendant CVS on 9/14. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******7784
Case Title:REGAL STONE LIMITED et al VS. LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. et al
Court Date:AUG-11-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To File First Amended Complaint Under Seal
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, August 11, 2011, line 7. PLAINTIFF REGAL STONE LIMITED, FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S Motion To File First Amended Complaint Under Seal. Continued to October 6, 2011 per moving party. =(302/LMG)


Case Number:*******7784
Case Title:REGAL STONE LIMITED et al VS. LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C. et al
Court Date:APR-28-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To File First Amended Complaint Under Seal
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, April 28, 2011, line 7. PLAINTIFFS REGAL STONE LIMITED, FLEET MANAGEMENT LTD'S Motion To File First Amended Complaint Under Seal. Continued to August 11, 2011 per agreement of the parties. =(302/LMG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLEET MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS/CAREMARK RHODE ISLAND CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAPOINTE JON-PAUL