Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 04:45:15 (UTC).

REBECCA CHAMORRO ET AL VS. DIGNITY HEALTH ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2015 REBECCA CHAMORRO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, HAROLD E. KAHN and JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9626

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHAMORRO, REBECCA

PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Defendants and Others

DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A/ MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING

DIGNITY HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

Defendant and Respondent

DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

Intervenor

CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAWSON, RUTHA

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

1313 West Eighth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

SAUNDERS, CHRISTINE R.

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLPSALESFORCE TOWER

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILL, ELIZABETH O

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

AMIRI, BRIGITTE

Attorney at REPRODUCTIVE FREEDOM PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

KANDEL, MINOUCHE D

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

1313 West 8Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

DAWSON, RUTH

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

1313 West Eighth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LANDSBERG, BARRY S

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

11355 West Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LE BLANC, JOHN M

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

11355 West Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Intervenor Attorneys

DURIE, DARALYN J

Attorney at DURIE TANGRI LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

DO, LONG X.

Attorney at CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION

1201 J Street Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 958142906

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A/ MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-01-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-26-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-09-2016 (Fee:450.00)

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHAMORROS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Defendant Dignity Healths Appendix of Evidence Part 1 of 3 Exhibits 1-

DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTHS APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE PART 1 OF 3 EXHIBITS 1-7 IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF REBECCA CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58366355) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SAUNDERS HASKETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNO

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SAUNDERS HASKETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58395733) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (HEARING-1/14/16)

Defendant Dignity Health Notice of Entry of Order Denying Plaintiff Re

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PLNTF REBECCA CHAMORRO'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58453648) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEADLINE TO RESPOND MAY 4, 2016)

Notice of Unopposed Verified Application to Admit Brigitte Amiri as Co

NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED VERIFIED APPLICATION TO ADMIT BRIGITTE AMIRI AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS (TRANSACTION ID # 58801973) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Declaration of Rebecca Jackson and Exhibits 1 through 11

DECLARATION OF REBECCA JACKSON AND EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 11 (TRANSACTION ID # 65979174) FILED BY PETITIONER CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTHS SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64432107) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

Respondent Dignity Healths Evidentiary Objections In Support Of Its Su

RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTHS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64422957) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

Respondent Dignity Healths Evidentiary Objections in Support of Its Mo

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63549116) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

[Redacted] Petitioners Response to Dignity Healths Separate Statement

RESPONSE TO DIGNITY HEALTHS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT[REDACTED] (TRANSACTION ID # 63490181) FILED BY PETITIONER CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIO

(REDACTED) APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 3 OF 3 EXHIBITS 32-38 (TRANSACTION ID # 63138763) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE [OF STATUS REPORT FOR DEC. 4, 2018, HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE] (TRANSACTION ID # 62713798) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Declaration of Harvey L. Rochman In Support Of Respondents Opposition

DECLARATION OF HARVEY L. ROCHMAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF PERSON MOST QUALIFIED (TRANSACTION ID # 62621468) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DIGNIT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 60131267) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

261 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): Hearing On Petition For Writ (Per Order Filed 3\/25\/19); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 505; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 505; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion To Stay Proceedings Or, In The Alternative, Continue Hearing On Writ Petition; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 505; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0620A13M013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 66013176) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF COLIN M. MCGRATH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE HEARING ON WRIT PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 66013176) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY AND OR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66013176) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE HEARING ON WRIT PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 66013176) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING) HEARING SET FOR OCT-20-2020 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 505 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66000836) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTHS TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 66000836) FILED BY RESPONDENT DIGNITY HEALTH (INCLUDING DBA MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
448 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2015
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5215C30M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF REBECCA CHAMORRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SAUNDERS HASKETT IN SUPPORT OF REBECCA CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DR. SAMUEL VAN KIRK IN SUPPORT OF REBECCA CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DR. REBECCA JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF REBECCA CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHAMORROS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58353959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1115C28F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAMORRO, REBECCA PHYSICIANS FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DIGNITY HEALTH D/B/A/ MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-01-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-26-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-09-2016 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURIE DARALYN JEANNINE