This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 01:22:29 (UTC).

RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR. VS. RECOLOGY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RECOLOGY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2575

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

MIRT, MARCUS J.

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

RECOLOGY, INC.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIONS.

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271328) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023

Civil Case Coversheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68271328) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JAN-23-2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-11-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MIRT, MARCUS J.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-11-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MIRT, MARCUS J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JAN-23-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialPayment: REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: H2422C19C002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFEE PD ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: R4122A28F003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68271328) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271328) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less