This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/08/2023 at 11:37:38 (UTC).

RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR. VS. RECOLOGY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RECOLOGY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD B. ULMER, CURTIS KARNOW and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2574

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD B. ULMER

CURTIS KARNOW

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

MIRT, MARCUS J.

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

RECOLOGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HAGOPIAN, MARK ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE POR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF HIS COMPLAINT; AND, DECLARATION [CASE NO. CGC-22-602574] (TRANSACTION ID # 69234049) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-11-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MIRT, MARCUS J.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JAN-23-2023

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIONS.

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT AND ORDER STAYING THE ACTION.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-22-2023 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. MCKIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC

DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. MCKIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY; RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.; AND MARCUS J. MIRT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-10-2023 Continued To Nov-01-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-03-2023 CONTINUED TO NOV-01-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 69687951) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT AND ORDER STAYING THE ACTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAR-28-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAR-28-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Portions Of Complaint Off Calendar Mar-28-2023 Granted Per Written Order MINI MINUTES: APPEARANCES (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE): Atty. RICHARD D. MCKIE, Esq. of Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP (Tel: 415-217-6990) for defendants Recology, Inc., Golden Gate Disposal and Recycling Company, Recology San Francisco, Inc., and Marcus J. Mirt; No other appearances made in this matter. HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., AND MARCUS MIRT's Motion To Strike Portions Of Complaint. Matter not contested\/argued. The Court adopts its tentative ruling. Defendant's motion to strike is granted without leave to amend. Plaintiff's complaint describes at most, careless conduct in the collecting of trash. Such allegations are insufficient to impose punitive damages. (See Pacific Gas and Electric Company v. Superior Court (2018) 24 Cal.App.5th 1150, 1170 (Butte Fire Cases) ["Punitive damages are appropriate if the defendant's acts are reprehensible, fraudulent or in blatant violation of law or policy. The mere carelessness or ignorance of the defendant does not justify the imposition of punitive damages. ... Punitive damages are proper only when the tortious conduct rises to levels of extreme indifference to the plaintiff's rights, a level which decent citizens should not have to tolerate." (internal quotations omitted)].) Plaintiff's prayer for attorney's fees is improper since he is proceeding in pro per. (See Ellis Law Group, LLP v. Nevada City Sugar Loaf Properties, LLC (2014) 230 Cal.App.4th 244, 253 [self-represented attorney was not entitled to award of attorney's fees].) Lastly, pursuant to CCP 128(a)(8), the court sua sponte stays this action. The court believes that resolution of consolidated action CGC-19-581651 before this case is litigated may conserve party and judicial resources. Single order signed as to demurrer and motion to strike. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr.; Clerk: Sean Kane; Not Reported. (302\/RBU); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): DEMURRER to COMPLAINT Off Calendar Mar-28-2023 Overruled MINI MINUTES: APPEARANCES (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE): Atty. RICHARD D. MCKIE, Esq. of Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP (Tel: 415-217-6990) for defendants Recology, Inc., Golden Gate Disposal and Recycling Company, Recology San Francisco, Inc., and Marcus J. Mirt; No other appearances made in this matter. HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., AND MARCUS MIRT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. Matter not contested\/argued. The Court adopts its tentative ruling. Defendants' demurrer based on CCP 430.10(c) is overruled. The complaints fail to show that the "same cause of action" is pleaded in CGC-19-581651 and this action. A plea in abatement is disfavored. (See Lord v. Garland (1946) 27 Cal.2d 840, 848.) "Where, for all that appears in the complaint, the prior suit does not involve the entire cause of action presented by the complaint in the later litigation, the plea of abatement should be raised by answer rather than by demurrer. As a test for determining whether the causes of action are the same or different, it is the universal rule that a plea in abatement may be maintained only where the claim sued upon in the second action is such that a final judgment in the first one could be pleaded in bar as a former adjudication." (Id.; see also Plant Insulation Co. v. Fibreboard Corp. (1990) 224 Cal.App.3d 781, 787-788 [same].) Here, a ruling in defendants' favor in CGC-19-581651 would not have a preclusive effect on the claims in plaintiff's later actions. "A person harmed by a continuing nuisance 'may bring successive actions for damages until the nuisance is abated.'" (Lyles v. State of California (2007) 153 Cal.App.4th 281, 291.) Defendant Mirt's demurrer to the complaint is overruled. (See CCP 430.10(e).) Plaintiff alleges that defendant "Recology's" trash collection activities are causing a nuisance and Mirt, an employee of Recology, is responsible for the trash collection efforts. (Complaint, pars. 6-7.) It is unclear why plaintiff named Mirt since plaintiff alleges that Recology is causing the nuisance, Mirt's alleged liability arose as a consequence of the discharge of his duties, and Recology is obligated to indemnify Mirt for the alleged tort per Labor Code sec. 2802. In any event, plaintiff states a claim against Mirt. The complaint alleges that Mirt was the individual responsible for causing the nuisance. (Complaint, pars. 6-7.) An agent can be responsible for his\/her wrongful torts. (See Civil Code sec. 2343; Peredia v. HR Mobile Services, Inc. (2018) 25 Cal.App.5th 680, 692 ["an agent is liable for his or her own torts, whether the principal is liable or not, and in spite of the fact that the agent acted in accordance with the principal's directions."].) Single order signed as to demurrer and motion to strike. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr.; Clerk: Sean Kane; Not Reported. (302\/RBU); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketLAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, AS TO THE MAR-28-2023 HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., AND MARCUS MIRT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT, THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. PURSUANT TO CCP 128(A)(8), THE COURT SUA SPONTE STAYS THIS ACTION. (SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR DETAILS.) SINGLE ORDER SIGNED AS TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR.; CLERK: SEAN KANE; NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COURT OF IMPROVED FINANCIAL SITUATION STARTING DEC-02-2022 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialPayment: REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: H2422C19C003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFEE PD ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT NOTICE TO COURT OF IMPROVED FINANCIAL SITUATION WAS FILED ON DEC-02-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: R4122A28F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:CGC22602574
Case Title:RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR. VS. RECOLOGY, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-28-2023 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER to COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, March 28, 2023, Line 11, 1 - DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., MARCUS MIRT'S DEMURRER to COMPLAINT*THE COURT'S FULL AND COMPLETE TENTATIVE RULING HAS BEEN EMAILED TO COUNSEL*Defendants' demurrer based on CCP 430.10(c) is overruled. The complaints fail to show that the "same cause of action" is pleaded in CGC-19-581651 and this action.For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the defendants is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address.= (302/RBU)