This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 01:29:30 (UTC).

RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR. VS. RECOLOGY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 RAYMOND VINCENT DIGIACOMO JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RECOLOGY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD B. ULMER, CURTIS KARNOW and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2574

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD B. ULMER

CURTIS KARNOW

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

MIRT, MARCUS J.

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

RECOLOGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HAGOPIAN, MARK ANDREW

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY;

REPLY TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69270972) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE POR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF HIS COMPLAINT; AND, DECLARATION [CASE NO. CGC-22-602574] (TRANSACTION ID # 69234049) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-22-2023 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY;

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. MCKIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC

DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. MCKIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY; RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.; AND MARCUS J. MIRT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J.

DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY;

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. HEARING SET FOR MAR-10-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC.; GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY;

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 69132025) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. HEARING SET FOR MAR-10-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-11-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MIRT, MARCUS J.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JAN-23-2023

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Civil Case Coversheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIONS.

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): DEMURRER to COMPLAINT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Portions Of Complaint; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Feb-27-2023 Continued To May-03-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., MARCUS MIRT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 28, 2023 AT 9:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 302 TO BE HEARD WITH THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. JUDGE: CURTIS E.A. KARNOW; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (302/CK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., MARCUS MIRT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 28, 2023 AT 9:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 302 TO BE HEARD WITH THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. JUDGE: CURTIS E.A. KARNOW; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (302/CK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAR-10-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAR-10-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): DEMURRER to COMPLAINT Off Calendar Mar-10-2023 Continued To Mar-28-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 302 MINI MINUTES: No appearance. The court adopted its tentative ruling. DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., MARCUS MIRT'S DEMURRER to COMPLAINT is Continued to March 28, 2023, to be heard with the motion to consolidate. Judge: Curtis E.A. Karnow; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Proceedings not reported. (302\/CK); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: CURTIS KARNOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Portions Of Complaint Off Calendar Mar-10-2023 Continued To Mar-28-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 302 MINI MINUTES: No appearance. The court adopted its tentative ruling. DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY, INC., GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY, RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC., MARCUS MIRT'S Motion To Strike Portions Of Complaint is Continued to March 28, 2023, to be heard with the motion to consolidate. Judge: Curtis E.A. Karnow; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Proceedings not reported. (302\/CK); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: CURTIS KARNOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE TO JAN-23-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialPayment: REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: H2422C19C003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFEE PD ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: R4122A28F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68271253) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIGIACOMO JR., RAYMOND VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL AND RECYCLING COMPANY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, INC. MIRT, MARCUS J. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less