This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/08/2023 at 11:52:53 (UTC).

RAYMOND HILL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2003 RAYMOND HILL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., DAVID BALLATI, KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, ROBERT L. DONDERO, RICHARD A. KRAMER, GARRETT L. WONG, PAUL H. ALVARADO, PETER J. BUSCH, TOMAR MASON, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, BRUCE E. CHAN and DONNA J. HITCHENS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1716

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS J. MELLON, JR.

DAVID BALLATI

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

ROBERT L. DONDERO

RICHARD A. KRAMER

GARRETT L. WONG

PAUL H. ALVARADO

PETER J. BUSCH

TOMAR MASON

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

BRUCE E. CHAN

DONNA J. HITCHENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL, RAYMOND

Defendants

PACCAR INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

SCANDURA, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CSK AUTO INC

ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC

PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

A.H. VOSS COMPANY

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS AS SUCCESSOR TO EIS BRAKE PARTS

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

HUTCHINSON, THOMAS H

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

TOWLE, EDMUND J

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

BERNARD, RANDALL K

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Other Attorneys

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

POND, FRANK D

OBERG, LISA L

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

BAKER, MARGARET PAULA

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HILL, RAYMOND AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-17-2004 (Fee:224.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.H. VOSS COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Fee:261.20)

STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER FILED BY OTHER

STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER FILED BY OTHER DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO INC (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL --ELECTRONICALLY FILED FID# 2339590-- FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ABEX CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL MATERIALS-WISCONSIN (Fee:261.20)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2011
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEE TRANSFER; Payment Type: TRAN/FORF; Receipt Number: B0211809J032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketJURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1606515J005 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20265694) AS TO DEFENDANT SCANDURA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15470439) AS TO DEFENDANT COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • DocketJURY FEES OF0000000 FOR TRANSACTION TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13580705) AS TO DEFENDANT CARLISLE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13532251) AS TO DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12883723) AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • FinancialPayment: PER DIEM FEES; Amount: $700; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: B9506A23R007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • DocketPER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED; Fee: $700.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
243 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION; Fee: $261.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2003
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $221.2; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: B4903820F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $221.2; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2103818F032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Fee: $221.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.H. VOSS COMPANY; Fee: $221.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $221.2; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1903801F022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION; Fee: $221.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $224.5; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1103624F021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HILL, RAYMOND AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-17-2004; Fee: $224.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less